Miescke, David v. Village of McFarland
Plaintiff: David J. Miescke
Defendant: Village of McFarland
Case Number: 3:2019cv00572
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Village of McFarland. (voc)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff David J. Miescke. (Henderson, Brady)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Exhibit to #1 Complaint, filed by David J. Miescke. (JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet.) (Henderson, Brady)
July 15, 2019 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (voc)
July 15, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (voc)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Brady Ross Henderson for Plaintiff David J. Miescke. (Henderson, Brady)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Village of McFarland, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2500762.), filed by David J. Miescke. (Henderson, Brady) Modified on 7/12/2019: Corrected defendant. Removed plaintiff's address. Requested JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miescke, David v. Village of McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David J. Miescke
Represented By: Brady Ross Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?