Bordeau, Roy et al v. Bonafide Recovery & Transport LLC
Plaintiff: Roy Bordeau and Nancy Bordeau
Defendant: Bonafide Recovery & Transport LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00581
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Set Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 9/12/2019 at 01:30 PM rescheduled to 9/18/2019 at 03:00 PM to accommodate the court's calendar. Counsel for the Plaintiff remains responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. (cak)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (DeLadurantey, Nathan)
August 8, 2019 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 9/12/2019 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (kwf)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Bonafide Recovery & Transport LLC. (Ehrke, William)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendant Bonafide Recovery & Transport LLC. (Ehrke, William)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by William Warren Ehrke for Defendant Bonafide Recovery & Transport LLC. (Ehrke, William)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bonafide Recovery & Transport LLC. (voc)
July 16, 2019 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (voc)
July 16, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (voc)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs Nancy Bordeau, Roy Bordeau. (DeLadurantey, Nathan)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bonafide Recovery & Transport LLC, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2502517.), filed by Roy Bordeau, Nancy Bordeau, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (DeLadurantey, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bordeau, Roy et al v. Bonafide Recovery & Transport LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonafide Recovery & Transport LLC
Represented By: William Warren Ehrke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Bordeau
Represented By: Matthew Curtiss Lein
Represented By: Nathan Edward DeLadurantey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Bordeau
Represented By: Matthew Curtiss Lein
Represented By: Nathan Edward DeLadurantey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?