United States of America v. Hanson, Andrew et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Chaseburg Farmers Union Cooperative, Katie Jean Hanson, Vernon Memorial Hospital, Andrew Edward Hanson, Summit Credit Union, Gundersen Lutheran Administrative Services, Inc. and Westby Co-op Credit Union
Case Number: 3:2019cv00583
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Katie Jean Hanson. (jls)
August 28, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff United States of America. (Oswald, Barbara)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Andrew Edward Hanson. Andrew Edward Hanson waiver sent on 7/18/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Oswald, Barbara)
August 9, 2019 Party Summit Credit Union is terminated pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a) without further order of the court. (jls)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (of Defendant Summit Credit Union) by Plaintiff United States of America, (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Oswald, Barbara) Modified on 8/8/2019. (lak)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Gundersen Lutheran Administrative Services, Inc. Gundersen Lutheran Administrative Services, Inc. waiver sent on 7/18/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Oswald, Barbara)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Westby Co-op Credit Union. Westby Co-op Credit Union waiver sent on 7/18/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Oswald, Barbara)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Vernon Memorial Hospital. Vernon Memorial Hospital waiver sent on 7/18/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Oswald, Barbara)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Chaseburg Farmers Union Cooperative. Chaseburg Farmers Union Cooperative waiver sent on 7/18/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Oswald, Barbara)
July 18, 2019 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Notice to Creditors. (jls)
July 18, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Lis Pendens by Plaintiff United States of America. (Oswald, Barbara)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - 04.11.2014 Promissory Note, #3 Exhibit B - 08.13.2013 Promissory Note, #4 Exhibit C - 06.08.2009 Promissory Note, #5 Exhibit D - 05.30.2008 Promissory Note, #6 Exhibit E - 02.12.2008 Promissory Note, #7 Exhibit F - 02.12.2008 Promissory Note, #8 Exhibit G - 10.19.2006 Promissory Note, #9 Exhibit H - 05.06.2005 Promissory Note, #10 Exhibit I - 04.11.2014 Security Agreement, #11 Exhibit J - 10.04.2018 Security Agreement, #12 Exhibit K - 02.16.2015 Financing Statement Amendment, #13 Exhibit L - 02.16.2015 Continuation Statement, #14 Exhibit M - 08.13.2013 Financing Statement Amendment, #15 Exhibit N - 03.29.2010 Continuation Statement, #16 Exhibit O - 05.05.2005 Financing Statement, #17 Exhibit P - 04.11.2014 Mortgage, #18 Exhibit Q - 02.14.2018 Notice of Acceleration) (Oswald, Barbara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Hanson, Andrew et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaseburg Farmers Union Cooperative
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie Jean Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vernon Memorial Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Edward Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gundersen Lutheran Administrative Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westby Co-op Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Barbara L Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?