Shubat, Chelsea et al v. Cave Enterprises Operations, LLC
Plaintiff: Chelsea Shubat and Allison R. Shubat
Defendant: Cave Enterprises Operations, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00588
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Set Hearing: Default Hearing set for 9/25/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 250 before District Judge William M. Conley. (kwf)
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 Affidavit of Max T. Lindsey filed by Plaintiffs Allison R. Shubat, Chelsea Shubat re: #9 Motion for Default Judgment. (lak)
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 Motion for Default Judgment as to Cave Enterprises Operations, LLC by Chelsea Shubat, Allison Shubat, (Attachments: #1 Disregard., #2 Cover Letter, #3 Certificate of Service) (Lindsey, Max) Modified on 8/29/2019. (lak)
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 Clerk's Entry of Default as to Defendant Cave Enterprises Operations, LLC. (lak)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Service by Plaintiffs Allison R. Shubat, Chelsea Shubat as to #4 Motion for Entry of Default as to Cave Enterprises Operations, LLC. (Lindsey, Max)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 Exhibit to #4 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Allison R. Shubat, Chelsea Shubat. Proposed Entry of Default. (Lindsey, Max)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 Affidavit of Attorney Max T. Lindsey filed by Plaintiffs Allison R. Shubat, Chelsea Shubat re: #4 Motion for Entry of Default. (Lindsey, Max)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 Motion for Entry of Default as to Cave Enterprises Operations, LLC by Allison R. Shubat, Chelsea Shubat. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Lindsey, Max) Modified on 8/22/2019. (lak)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Cave Enterprises Operations, LLC served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (Lindsey, Max)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Cave Enterprises Operations, LLC. (kwf)
July 22, 2019 Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf)
July 22, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cave Enterprises Operations, LLC, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2505018.), filed by Chelsea Shubat, Allison R. Shubat, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Lindsey, Max) Modified on 7/19/2019. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shubat, Chelsea et al v. Cave Enterprises Operations, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelsea Shubat
Represented By: Max Thomas Lindsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison R. Shubat
Represented By: Max Thomas Lindsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cave Enterprises Operations, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?