CURT Manufacturing, LLC v. Howard Auto Parts Corporation et al
Plaintiff: CURT Manufacturing, LLC
Defendant: John Does 1-100 and Howard Auto Parts Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv00589
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Howard Auto Parts Corporation served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Howe, Stephen)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Howard Auto Parts Corporation. (kwf)
July 22, 2019 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (kwf)
July 22, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff CURT Manufacturing, LLC. (Howe, Stephen)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 TRADEMARK COMPLAINT against Howard Auto Parts Corporation, John Does 1-100 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2505173.) TRADEMARKS AT ISSUE: Trademark # 2329616, issued 10/10/06, held by CURT Manufacturing, LLC; Trademark # 4798868, issued 8/25/15, held by CURT Manufacturing, LLC; Trademark # 4568632, issued 7/15/14, held by CURT Manufacturing, LLC, filed by CURT Manufacturing, LLC, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Disregard. Not to be e-filed.) (Howe, Stephen) Modified on 7/19/2019: Removed addresses of parties. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CURT Manufacturing, LLC v. Howard Auto Parts Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Auto Parts Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CURT Manufacturing, LLC
Represented By: Stephen Reid Howe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?