Budewitz, Sandra v. Daubert Law Firm, S.C.
Plaintiff: Sandra E. Budewitz
Defendant: Daubert Law Firm, S.C. and Michael Stueland
Case Number: 3:2019cv00593
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/11/2019. (jls)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Michael Stueland and Daubert Law Firm, S.C., filed by Sandra E. Budewitz. (Pagel, Briane) Modified on 9/19/2019. (lak)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Sandra E. Budewitz. (Pagel, Briane)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Daubert Law Firm, S.C. (jls)
July 30, 2019 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (jls)
July 30, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Daubert Law Firm, S.C., ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2510832.), filed by Sandra E. Budewitz, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Daubert Law Firm, S.C.) (Pagel, Briane) Modified on 7/30/2019. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Budewitz, Sandra v. Daubert Law Firm, S.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daubert Law Firm, S.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Stueland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra E. Budewitz
Represented By: Briane F. Pagel, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?