Empowered Marketing LLC v. Gomez, Frank et al
Plaintiff: Empowered Marketing LLC
Defendant: Frank Tomas Gomez
Case Number: 3:2019cv00598
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jeffrey Sturman withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/19/2019. (kwf)
September 10, 2019 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance filed by Joseph William Byrne for Plaintiff Empowered Marketing LLC. (Byrne, Joseph)
September 10, 2019 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance filed by Richard L. Bolton for Plaintiff Empowered Marketing LLC. (Bolton, Richard)
September 10, 2019 Set/Reset Briefing Deadlines as to #11 MOTION TO DISMISS in Part and for More Definite Statement. Brief in Opposition due 10/4/2019. Brief in Reply due 10/15/2019. (kwf)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **On July 23, 2019, plaintiff filed its complaint for declaratory relief in trademark (dkt. #2 ). On August 30, 2019, defendants filed a motion for partial dismissal and for a more definite statement (dkt. #11 ). Plaintiff's response is due September 20, 2019. On September 9, 2019, plaintiff's attorney filed a motion to withdraw, reporting that plaintiff has decided to proceed with a different attorney, who has not yet filed a notice of appearance (dkt. #14 ). Counsel's motion to withdraw is STAYED until replacement counsel actually files an appearance. As a courtesy to plaintiff's attorney(s), the deadline to respond to defendant's pending motion is extended to October 4, 2019. The court does not intend to extend this deadline again, regardless of plaintiff's situation with counsel. The deadline for both sides to submit their magistrate judge consent/declination is extended to October 4, 2019. The October 8, 2019 telephonic preliminary pretrial conference remains on the schedule, but the parties' deadline to submit their Rule 26(f) report is extended to October 7, 2019 at noon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/10/2019. (kwf)
September 9, 2019 Filing 14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff Empowered Marketing LLC. Response due 9/16/2019. (Sturman, Jeffrey)
September 3, 2019 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 10/8/2019 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (kwf)
September 3, 2019 Action Requested: If you have not already provided your #Consent to Magistrate/Request for Reassignment form, please do so by 9/13/2019. (lak)
August 30, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Empowered Marketing LLC. (Spafford, Kenneth)
August 30, 2019 Filing 12 Brief in Support of #11 Motion to Dismiss in Part and for More Definite Statement by Defendants Empowered Marketing LLC, Frank Tomas Gomez, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Wisconsin Department of Financial Institutions Tradename/Trademark Information, #2 Exhibit B - Printout of Cited Precedent, Church Girls, LLC v. Rodgers) (Spafford, Kenneth) Modified on 8/30/2019. (lak)
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS in Part and for More Definite Statement by Defendants Empowered Marketing LLC, Frank Tomas Gomez. Brief in Opposition due 9/20/2019. Brief in Reply due 9/30/2019. (Spafford, Kenneth) Modified on 8/30/2019. (lak)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #9 Motion to Admit Kenneth C. Spafford Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/29/2019. (lak)
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 Motion to Admit Kenneth C. Spafford Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2530536.) by Defendants Empowered Marketing LLC, Frank Tomas Gomez. (Spafford, Kenneth)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Frank Tomas Gomez, Empowered Marketing LLC. (kwf)
July 24, 2019 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (kwf)
July 24, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #1 Motion to Admit Jeffrey Sturman Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 7/24/2019. (lak)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 Disregard. Duplicate of #5 . Modified on 7/23/2019. (lak)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Empowered Marketing LLC. (Sturman, Jeffrey)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Empowered Marketing LLC. (Sturman, Jeffrey)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Empowered Marketing LLC. (Sturman, Jeffrey)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2507186.), filed by Empowered Marketing LLC, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Disregard. Exhibits 1 - 4 filed separately and described.) (Sturman, Jeffrey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/23/2019: #3 Exhibit 1 - Uniform Domain Name (Domain Name) Dispute Resolution Policy, #4 Exhibit 2 - Trademark/Service Mark Application, Principal Register, #5 Exhibit 3 - Patent and Trademark Office Document, #6 Exhibit 4 - Wisconsin Department of Financial Institutions Document) (lak) Detailed e-mail sent to counsel re: exhibits and descriptions.
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 Motion to Admit Jeffrey Sturman Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2507155.) by Plaintiff Empowered Marketing LLC. (Sturman, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Empowered Marketing LLC v. Gomez, Frank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Tomas Gomez
Represented By: Kenneth C Spafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Empowered Marketing LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Sturman
Represented By: Richard L. Bolton
Represented By: Joseph William Byrne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?