Bad River Band of the Lake Superior Tribe of Chippewa Indians of the Bad River Reservation v. Enbridge Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bad River Band of the Lake Superior Tribe of Chippewa Indians of the Bad River Reservation
Defendant: Enbridge Inc., Enbridge Energy, L.P., Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P. and Enbridge Energy Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00602
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 25:640
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #13 Motion to Admit Zakariya Varshovi Pro Hac Vice; granting #14 Motion to Admit David L. Feinberg Pro Hac Vice; granting #15 Motion to Admit Michael C. Davis Pro Hac Vice; granting #16 Motion to Admit Justin Nemeroff Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 9/5/2019. (lak)
September 4, 2019 Filing 16 Motion to Admit Justin Nemeroff Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2533589.) by Defendants Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy, L.P., Enbridge Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Nemeroff, Justin)
September 4, 2019 Filing 15 Motion to Admit Michael C. Davis Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2533556.) by Defendants Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy, L.P., Enbridge Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Davis, Michael)
September 4, 2019 Filing 14 Motion to Admit David L. Feinberg Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2533550.) by Defendants Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy, L.P., Enbridge Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Feinberg, David)
September 4, 2019 Filing 13 Motion to Admit Zakariya Varshovi Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2533482.) by Defendants Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy, L.P., Enbridge Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Varshovi, Zakariya)
July 29, 2019 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Enbridge Energy, L.P. Enbridge Energy, L.P. waiver sent on 7/26/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. (Kanji, Riyaz)
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Enbridge Energy Company, Inc. Enbridge Energy Company, Inc. waiver sent on 7/26/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. (Kanji, Riyaz)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P. Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P. waiver sent on 7/26/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. (Kanji, Riyaz)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Enbridge Inc. Enbridge Inc. waiver sent on 7/26/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. (Kanji, Riyaz)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Oday Salim for Plaintiff Bad River Band of the Lake Superior Tribe of Chippewa Indians of the Bad River Reservation. (Salim, Oday)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Bruce T. Wallace for Plaintiff Bad River Band of the Lake Superior Tribe of Chippewa Indians of the Bad River Reservation. (Wallace, Bruce)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Philip Tinker for Plaintiff Bad River Band of the Lake Superior Tribe of Chippewa Indians of the Bad River Reservation. (Tinker, Philip)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Jane Steadman for Plaintiff Bad River Band of the Lake Superior Tribe of Chippewa Indians of the Bad River Reservation. (Steadman, Jane)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by David Giampetroni for Plaintiff Bad River Band of the Lake Superior Tribe of Chippewa Indians of the Bad River Reservation. (Giampetroni, David)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Cory Albright for Plaintiff Bad River Band of the Lake Superior Tribe of Chippewa Indians of the Bad River Reservation. (Albright, Cory)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., Enbridge Energy, L.P., Enbridge Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P., #2 Summons Enbridge Energy Company, Inc., #3 Summons Enbridge Energy, L.P.) (voc)
July 24, 2019 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (voc)
July 24, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (voc)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2507114.), filed by Bad River Band of the Lake Superior Tribe of Chippewa Indians of the Bad River Reservation, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons) (Kanji, Riyaz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bad River Band of the Lake Superior Tribe of Chippewa Indians of the Bad River Reservation v. Enbridge Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bad River Band of the Lake Superior Tribe of Chippewa Indians of the Bad River Reservation
Represented By: Riyaz A Kanji
Represented By: Philip Tinker
Represented By: Jane Steadman
Represented By: Oday Salim
Represented By: Bruce T. Wallace
Represented By: Cory J Albright
Represented By: David A Giampetroni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enbridge Inc.
Represented By: David L. Feinberg
Represented By: Michael C. Davis
Represented By: Zakariya Varshovi
Represented By: Justin Nemeroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enbridge Energy, L.P.
Represented By: David L. Feinberg
Represented By: Michael C. Davis
Represented By: Zakariya Varshovi
Represented By: Justin Nemeroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enbridge Energy Partners, L.P.
Represented By: David L. Feinberg
Represented By: Michael C. Davis
Represented By: Zakariya Varshovi
Represented By: Justin Nemeroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enbridge Energy Company, Inc.
Represented By: David L. Feinberg
Represented By: Michael C. Davis
Represented By: Zakariya Varshovi
Represented By: Justin Nemeroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?