United States of America v. Aleksinski, Sheryl et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Ginger Aleksinski, Sheryl A. Aleksinski and Office of the Treasurer, Vilas County, Wisconsin
Case Number: 3:2019cv00611
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER by Defendant Ginger Aleksinski. (Bacher, Nicole),(ps)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Nicole Marklein Bacher for Defendant Ginger Aleksinski. (Bacher, Nicole),(ps)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Sheryl A. Aleksinski answer due 9/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/4/2019. (voc)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer by Defendant Sheryl A. Aleksinski. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 9/10/2019. (arw)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ginger Aleksinski, Sheryl A. Aleksinski, Office of the Treasurer, Vilas County, Wisconsin. (Attachments: #1 Summons- Ginger Aleksinski, #2 Summons- Office of the Treasurer, Vilas County, Wisconsin) (voc)
July 26, 2019 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (voc)
July 26, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (voc)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (Aberg, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Aleksinski, Sheryl et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ginger Aleksinski
Represented By: Nicole Marklein Bacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheryl A. Aleksinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Treasurer, Vilas County, Wisconsin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Eric Martin Aberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?