Chipman, James et al v. Bates Legal Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Tiffany J. Chipman and James B. Chipman
Defendant: Bates Legal Group, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00614
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Settlement by Plaintiffs James B. Chipman, Tiffany J. Chipman (Lein, Matthew)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. Bates Legal Group, LLC answer due 9/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/23/2019. (jls)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Bates Legal Group, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 8/30/2019. (Bates, Justin)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Justin Bates for Defendant Bates Legal Group, LLC. (Bates, Justin)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Bates Legal Group, LLC served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Lein, Matthew)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Bates Legal Group, LLC. (jls)
July 30, 2019 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jls)
July 30, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bates Legal Group, LLC, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2510478.), filed by James B. Chipman, Tiffany J. Chipman, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Voluntary Petition, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Appearance, #3 Exhibit C - Docket for Case No.: 18-10489, #4 Exhibit D - CCAP Docket, #5 Exhibit E - Motion, #6 Exhibit F - Emails Between Lein & Bates, #7 Summons, #8 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lein, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chipman, James et al v. Bates Legal Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany J. Chipman
Represented By: Matthew Curtiss Lein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James B. Chipman
Represented By: Matthew Curtiss Lein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bates Legal Group, LLC
Represented By: Justin Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?