McGowan, James v. Regal Beloit America, Inc.
Plaintiff: James McGowan and James F. McGowan
Defendant: Regal Beloit America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00625
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Regal Beloit America, Inc. Regal Beloit America, Inc. waiver sent on 8/1/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (McDonald, Shannon)
September 4, 2019 Action Requested: Counsel for plaintiff requested to file proof of service. (jat)
August 1, 2019 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jat)
August 1, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jat)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Regal Beloit America, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2512448.), filed by James McGowan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Right to Sue Letter, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (McDonald, Shannon) Modified on 8/1/2019 (jat).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGowan, James v. Regal Beloit America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regal Beloit America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James McGowan
Represented By: Shannon Daniel McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James F. McGowan
Represented By: Shannon Daniel McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?