Jakobson, KJ v. City Of Viroqua
Plaintiff: KJ JAKOBSON
Defendant: City Of Viroqua
Case Number: 3:2019cv00627
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), this case is closed without further order of the court. (nln/jcf),(ps)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff KJ Jakobson (Jakobson, KJ),(ps)
August 5, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Morgan Kathleen Stippel for Defendant City Of Viroqua. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Stippel, Morgan),(ps)
August 1, 2019 Judge update in case. Case now assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (nln),(ps)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Vernon County Circuit Court, case number 19cv78. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0758-2512533) filed by City Of Viroqua. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint (Vernon Co), #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service) (Lubinsky, Lori)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jakobson, KJ v. City Of Viroqua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Viroqua
Represented By: Lori Marie Lubinsky
Represented By: Morgan Kathleen Stippel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KJ JAKOBSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?