United States of America v. Johnson, Barbara et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Red Cliff Band Of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians, Barbara L. Johnson and Wayne S. King
Case Number: 3:2019cv00629
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Wayne S. King. Wayne S. King waiver sent on 9/4/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. (Oswald, Barbara)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Red Cliff Band Of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians. Red Cliff Band Of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians waiver sent on 8/2/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. (Oswald, Barbara)
August 2, 2019 Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Notice to Creditors. (kwf)
August 2, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Lis Pendens by Plaintiff United States of America. (Oswald, Barbara)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - 06.20.2010 Lease, #3 Exhibit B - 08.13.2010 Promissory Note, #4 Exhibit C - 08.13.2010 Mortgage, #5 Exhibit D - Title Status Report, #6 Exhibit E - Assignment of Mortgage to Jackson County Bank, #7 Exhibit F - Indian Loan Guarantee Certificate, #8 Exhibit G - Assignment of Mortgage, #9 Exhibit H - Notices of Right to Cure Default, #10 Exhibit I - Notice of Right of First Refusal, #11 Exhibit J - Single Family Application for Insurance Benefits, #12 Exhibit K - Wire Transfer Receipt) (Oswald, Barbara) Modified on 8/2/2019. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Johnson, Barbara et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Cliff Band Of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne S. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Barbara L Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?