Hansen, Kristi v. Beaver Dam Community Hospitals, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kristi Hansen
Defendant: Beaver Dam Community Hospitals, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00633
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Laura Malugade for Defendant Beaver Dam Community Hospitals, Inc. (Malugade, Laura)
September 25, 2019 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2019 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jls)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Beaver Dam Community Hospitals, Inc. (Godar, Thomas)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER by Defendant Beaver Dam Community Hospitals, Inc. (Godar, Thomas)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Beaver Dam Community Hospitals, Inc. Beaver Dam Community Hospitals, Inc. waiver sent on 8/2/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. (Luzi, Scott)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Thomas P. Godar for Defendant Beaver Dam Community Hospitals, Inc. (Godar, Thomas)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by James A. Walcheske for Plaintiff Kristi Hansen. (Walcheske, James)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Beaver Dam Community Hospitals, Inc. (jls)
August 2, 2019 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (jls)
August 2, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Scott Stanton Luzi for Plaintiff Kristi Hansen. (Luzi, Scott)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Beaver Dam Community Hospitals, Inc., ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2513428.), filed by Kristi Hansen, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Jerard J. Jensen, #3 Hansen Consent to Join Form) (Luzi, Scott) Modified on 8/2/2019. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hansen, Kristi v. Beaver Dam Community Hospitals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beaver Dam Community Hospitals, Inc.
Represented By: Laura Malugade
Represented By: Thomas P. Godar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristi Hansen
Represented By: James A. Walcheske
Represented By: Scott Stanton Luzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?