Zebell, Leslie v. CW Recovery, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Leslie Zebell
Defendant: Capital One, N.A. and CW Recovery, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00638
Filed: August 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Returned Executed. CW Recovery, LLC served on 8/7/2019, answer due 8/28/2019. (Trueblood, Alexander)
September 24, 2019 Action Requested: Counsel for plaintiff requested to promptly file proof of service as to defendant CW Recovery, LLC. (kwf)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER by Defendant Capital One, N.A. (Fraioli, Marielise)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Capital One, N.A. answer due 9/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/20/2019. (kwf)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint by Defendant Capital One, N.A. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Fraioli, Marielise)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Capital One, N.A. (Fraioli, Marielise)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 Disregard; see #7 . Modified on 8/20/2019. (kwf)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew O. Stromquist for Defendant Capital One, N.A.. (Stromquist, Matthew)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Marielise Fraioli for Defendant Capital One, N.A.. (Fraioli, Marielise)
August 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CW Recovery, LLC and Capital One, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Capital One, N.A.) (arw)
August 5, 2019 Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (arw)
August 5, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw)
August 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0758-2514215) filed by Leslie Zebell (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - CW Recovery, LLC, #3 Summons - Capital One, N.A.) (Trueblood, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zebell, Leslie v. CW Recovery, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One, N.A.
Represented By: Matthew O. Stromquist
Represented By: Marielise Fraioli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CW Recovery, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Zebell
Represented By: Alexander Burnaby Trueblood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?