Fendryk, Randy et al v. Hays, Catalina et al
Plaintiff: Randy A. Fendryk and United Services Automobile Association
Defendant: Catalina Ivanovna Hays and Geico Choice Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00646
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Action Requested: Counsel for plaintiff requested to file proof of service re: Catalina Ivanovna Hays. (jat)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 Answer to Cross-Claim #6 by Plaintiff Randy A. Fendryk. (Fehring, Laurence) Modified on 9/11/2019 (jat).
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Geico Choice Insurance Company. (Scipior, Vincent)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Claim and Cross-Claim #6 by Defendant Geico Choice Insurance Company . (Scipior, Vincent) Modified on 9/11/2019 (jat).
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 Claim and Cross-Claim by Plaintiff United Services Automobile Association. (Thomas, Jennifer) Modified on 9/5/2019. (lak)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Jennifer Sue Thomas for Plaintiff United Services Automobile Association. (Thomas, Jennifer)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendant Geico Choice Insurance Company. (Scipior, Vincent)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Laurence Fehring for Plaintiff Randy A. Fendryk. (Fehring, Laurence)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Geico Choice Insurance Company, Catalina Ivanovna Hays, United Services Automobile Association. (jat)
August 7, 2019 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (jat)
August 7, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jat)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Geico Choice Insurance Company, Catalina Ivanovna Hays, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2515904.), filed by Randy A. Fendryk, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Geico Choice Insurance Company, #3 Summons - Catalina Ivanovna Hays, #4 Summons - USAA) (Trecek, Timothy) Modified on 8/6/2019: All documents are missing case number. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fendryk, Randy et al v. Hays, Catalina et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy A. Fendryk
Represented By: Timothy S. Trecek
Represented By: Laurence Fehring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Services Automobile Association
Represented By: Jennifer Sue Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catalina Ivanovna Hays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Choice Insurance Company
Represented By: Vincent J. Scipior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?