Schroeder, Ronald v. Tess, Sally et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Schroeder
Defendant: Lance Wiersma and Sally Tess
Not Yet Classified: OSCI Prison Facility
Case Number: 3:2019cv00650
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Barbara B Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), this case is closed without further order of the court. (nln),(ps)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Ronald Schroeder. (Attachments: #1 E-Filing Cover Sheet) (nln),(ps)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 Motion to Amend Complaint, by Plaintiff Ronald Schroeder. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Letter to Lance Wiersma dated 4/25/2019, #2 Ex. B - Letter to Ventae Parrow from Peter J. Marik dated 5/13/2019, #3 E-Filing Cover Sheet) (nln),(ps)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 Record from Dane County Circuit Court, Case No. 19CV1581. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Transmittal, #2 State Court Documents - Notice of Removal, Summons and Complaint, etc., #3 Envelope) (nln).
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 Notice from the Clerk regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-filing Information Packet) (nln),(ps)
August 7, 2019 Screening of Complaint Pursuant to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. (nln),(ps)
August 7, 2019 Standard attachments for District Judge Barbara B. Crabb required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (kwf)
August 7, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dane County Circuit Court, case number 19CV1581. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2516053), filed by Lance Wiersma, Sally Tess, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1- Summons and Complaint and Exhibits 1 - 25, #3 Certificate of Service) (Paulson, Rebecca) Modified on 8/7/2019. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schroeder, Ronald v. Tess, Sally et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Wiersma
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Paulson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sally Tess
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Paulson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: OSCI Prison Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?