Kreimeyer, Michelle v. Pratt (Beloit Corrugating), LLC
Plaintiff: Michelle J. Kreimeyer
Defendant: Pratt (Beloit Corrugating), LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00651
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Barbara B Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Pratt (Beloit Corrugating), LLC. Pratt (Beloit Corrugating), LLC waiver sent on 9/11/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (O'Connor, Patrick)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Kayla A. McCann for Defendant Pratt (Beloit Corrugating), LLC. (McCann, Kayla) Modified on 9/9/2019. (lak)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by David J.B. Froiland for Defendant Pratt (Beloit Corrugating), LLC. (Froiland, David) Modified on 9/9/2019. (lak)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 Signed Complaint re: #1 Complaint, filed by Michelle J. Kreimeyer. (O'Connor, Patrick) Modified on 8/8/2019. (lak)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Pratt (Beloit Corrugating), LLC. (voc)
August 7, 2019 Standard attachments for Judge Barbara B. Crabb required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (voc)
August 7, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (voc)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 Unsigned COMPLAINT against Pratt (Beloit Corrugating), LLC, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2516496.), filed by Michelle J. Kreimeyer, (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1 - WFEA Complaint, #4 Exhibit 2 - Right to Sue Letter) (O'Connor, Patrick) Modified on 8/8/2019. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kreimeyer, Michelle v. Pratt (Beloit Corrugating), LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle J. Kreimeyer
Represented By: Patrick O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pratt (Beloit Corrugating), LLC
Represented By: Dean Frederick Kelley
Represented By: David J.B. Froiland
Represented By: Kayla A. McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?