Kastern, Amber v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Plaintiff: Amber J. Kastern
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00655
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 Amended Certificate of Service by Defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC as to #8 Answer. (Bakane, Avanti)
September 27, 2019 Set Telephone Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 10/24/2019 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jat)
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER by Defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Bakane, Avanti)
August 28, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC answer due 9/27/2019. (jat)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER accepting and granting #6 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File Responsive Pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/28/19. (jat)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File Responsive Pleading, by Defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Bakane, Avanti)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Bakane, Avanti)
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Avanti D. Bakane for Defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Bakane, Avanti)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. (Lein, Matthew)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (jat)
August 8, 2019 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jat)
August 8, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jat)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2517554.), filed by Amber J. Kastern, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - First Notice of Representation, #3 Exhibit B - Second Notice of Representation, #4 Exhibit C - Portfolio Letter, #5 Summons) (Lein, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kastern, Amber v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Represented By: Avanti D. Bakane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber J. Kastern
Represented By: Matthew Curtiss Lein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?