Kent, Dawn v. BCG Equities, LLC
Plaintiff: Dawn M. Kent
Defendant: BCG Equities, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00658
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Settlement by Defendant BCG Equities, LLC. (Hanus, David)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #7 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant BCG Equities, LLC answer due 10/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/20/2019. (arw)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by October 4, 2019 by Defendant BCG Equities, LLC, (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Hanus, David) Modified on 9/19/2019. (lak)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER accepting and granting #5 Stipulation for Enlargement of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. BCG Equities, LLC answer due 9/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/3/2019. (kwf)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 Stipulation for Enlargement of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Defendant BCG Equities, LLC, (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Hanus, David)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by David John Hanus for Defendant BCG Equities, LLC. (Hanus, David)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. BCG Equities, LLC served on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Lein, Matthew)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to BCG Equities, LLC. (kwf)
August 12, 2019 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (kwf)
August 12, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BCG Equities, LLC, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2518413.), filed by Dawn M. Kent, (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lein, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kent, Dawn v. BCG Equities, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BCG Equities, LLC
Represented By: David John Hanus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn M. Kent
Represented By: Matthew Curtiss Lein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?