LaGrew, John v. Ashland Co. Sherrif Dept, WI. et al
Plaintiff: John Andrew LaGrew and John Andrew LaGrew, Jr.
Defendant: Ashland Co. Circut Court, Wi. and Ashland Co. Sherrif Dept, WI.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00663
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 7.86 assessed due by 9/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/30/2019. (rks),(ps)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 Resident Deposits Report by Plaintiff John Andrew LaGrew, Jr. (rks),(ps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/30/2019: #1 IPP Calculation) (rks).
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff John Andrew LaGrew, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rks),(ps)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Plaintiff to submit $400 or Motion for IFP due by 9/4/2019. Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 8/14/2019. (rks),(ps)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by John Andrew LaGrew. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rks),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LaGrew, John v. Ashland Co. Sherrif Dept, WI. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashland Co. Circut Court, Wi.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashland Co. Sherrif Dept, WI.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Andrew LaGrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Andrew LaGrew, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?