Kinyon, Ginger v. Anthem Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Ginger Kinyon
Defendant: Anthem Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00677
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Pretrial Conference Order: # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge William M. Conley attached. Amendments to the Pleadings due 11/1/2019. Dispositive Motions due 8/7/2020. Settlement Letters due 11/16/2020. Motions in Limine due 11/23/2020. Responses due 12/14/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/29/2020 at 4:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 1/11/2021 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/23/2019. (arw)
September 19, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 9/18/2019 [:10] (cak)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hetherington, Thomas)
September 4, 2019 Case randomly reassigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
August 23, 2019 Set Telephone Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 9/18/2019 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jat)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER by Defendant Anthem Life Insurance Company. (Hetherington, Thomas)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 Record from Dane County Circuit Court. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Removal to Plaintiff, #2 Notice of Filing Removal to Clerk, #3 Docket Sheet) See Attachments to Notice of Removal #2 for additional Circuit Court documents. (jat)
August 19, 2019 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (jat)
August 19, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jat)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Anthem Life Insurance Company. (Hetherington, Thomas) Modified on 8/19/2019: Exhibit is attached. (lak)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Declaration of Zanita Miller re: #2 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Long Term Disability Claim Form Employer Statement) (lak)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dane County Circuit Court, case number 2019CV001864, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2522070), filed by Anthem Life Insurance Company, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Schools Insurance Fund Insurance Trust Joinder Agreement for Long-Term Disability Insurance, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Service, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Appearance, #5 Exhibit E - State Court Docket Sheet, #6 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 Disregard. Refiled as #2 Notice of Removal.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kinyon, Ginger v. Anthem Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ginger Kinyon
Represented By: William Ernest Parsons
Represented By: Lynn Kristine Lodahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas F. A. Hetherington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?