Taylor, Corey v. LaCrosse County Sheriff's Office et al
Plaintiff: Corey Taylor
Defendant: City of LaCrosse, Sgt. Martell, LaCrosse County Sheriff's Office and Sgt. Thompson
Case Number: 3:2019cv00678
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that plaintiff Corey Taylor may have until October 23, 2019, to identify for the court which claims he wishes to pursue under this case number, and whether he wishes to pursue his other set of claims in a new lawsuit. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 10/2/2019. (rks),(ps)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff Corey Taylor's motion for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee is GRANTED. Plaintiff will not be assessed an initial partial fee for filing this case. However, plaintiff remains responsible for the full $350 filing fee for indigent litigants. Plaintiff's complaint taken under advisement for screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 9/20/2019. (nln),(ps)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Plaintiff Corey Taylor re: efforts to obtain inmate account statement and that plaintiff in unable to pay the filing fee. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nln),(ps)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from plaintiff regarding new address. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 Mail sent to Corey Taylor Returned as Undeliverable re #3 Order. Copy of #3 order, re-sent to plaintiff at Franklin County Detention Center (alternative address listed in #1 Complaint.) (nln),(ps)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff Corey Taylor to submit Inmate Account Statement by 9/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/19/2019. (nln),(ps)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Corey Taylor. (nln),(ps)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Corey Taylor. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nln),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor, Corey v. LaCrosse County Sheriff's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of LaCrosse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Martell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaCrosse County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?