Edgewood High School of the Sacred Heart, Inc. v. City of Madison, Wisconsin et al
Plaintiff: Edgewood High School of the Sacred Heart, Inc.
Defendant: George Hank, City of Madison, Matthew Tucker, City of Madison Zoning Board of Appeals and City of Madison, Wisconsin
Case Number: 3:2019cv00683
Filed: August 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:2000cc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2020 Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), this case is closed without further order of the court. (jls)
February 10, 2020 Filing 23 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Plaintiff Edgewood High School of the Sacred Heart, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Lee, Matthew) Modified on 2/10/2020. (lak)
January 31, 2020 Filing 22 Amended Answer to #1 Complaint, by Defendants City of Madison Zoning Board of Appeals, City of Madison, Wisconsin, George Hank, Matthew Tucker. (Blonien, Barry)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge William M. Conley attached. Amendments to Pleadings due 1/31/2020. Dispositive Motions due 10/2/2020. Settlement Letters due 1/29/2021. Motions in Limine due 2/5/2021. Response to Motion due 2/26/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/9/2021 at 04:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 3/22/2021 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/25/2019. (jls)
November 19, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 11/19/2019 [:10] (cak)
November 14, 2019 Filing 20 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Sterett, Noel)
October 31, 2019 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance filed by Sarah Anne Zylstra for Defendants City of Madison Zoning Board of Appeals, City of Madison, Wisconsin, George Hank, Matthew Tucker. (Zylstra, Sarah) Modified on 10/31/2019. (lak)
October 9, 2019 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 11/19/2019 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jls)
October 8, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER by Defendants City of Madison Zoning Board of Appeals, City of Madison, Wisconsin, George Hank, Matthew Tucker. (Blonien, Barry)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER accepting and entering #16 Stipulation. Answer due 10/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/19/2019. (jls)
September 17, 2019 Filing 16 Stipulation for Extension of Time by Defendants City of Madison Zoning Board of Appeals, City of Madison, Wisconsin, George Hank, Matthew Tucker. (Blonien, Barry) Modified on 9/17/2019. (lak)
September 17, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance filed by Barry Blonien for Defendants City of Madison Zoning Board of Appeals, City of Madison, Wisconsin, George Hank, Matthew Tucker. (Blonien, Barry)
September 11, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel by Kevin Michael LeRoy re: Plaintiff Edgewood High School of the Sacred Heart, Inc. (LeRoy, Kevin)
August 28, 2019 Filing 13 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. George Hank served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Lee, Matthew)
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Matthew Tucker served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Lee, Matthew)
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. City of Madison Zoning Board of Appeals served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Lee, Matthew)
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. City of Madison, Wisconsin served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Lee, Matthew)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #8 Motion to Admit Lawrence John Opalewski, Jr. Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/23/2019. (lak)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 Motion to Admit Lawrence John Opalewski, Jr. Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2526933.) by Plaintiff Edgewood High School of the Sacred Heart, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Opalewski, Lawrence)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #6 Motion to Admit Noel W. Sterett Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/23/2019. (lak)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 Motion to Admit Noel W. Sterett Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2526572.) by Plaintiff Edgewood High School of the Sacred Heart, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Sterett, Noel)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Kevin Michael LeRoy for Plaintiff Edgewood High School of the Sacred Heart, Inc. (LeRoy, Kevin)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 Exhibit to #1 Complaint filed by Edgewood High School of the Sacred Heart, Inc. Corrected Exhibit A. (Lee, Matthew)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to City of Madison Zoning Board of Appeals, City of Madison, Wisconsin, George Hank, and Matthew Tucker. (jls)
August 22, 2019 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jls)
August 22, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
August 21, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Edgewood High School of the Sacred Heart, Inc. (Lee, Matthew)
August 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2525246.), filed by Edgewood High School of the Sacred Heart, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - See #4 for Corrected Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B - Edgewood High School, Our History, #3 Exhibit C - Edgewood Mission Statement, #4 Exhibit D - Relevant Excerpts of Madison General Ordinances, #5 Exhibit E - Planning Division Staff Report, #6 Exhibit F - Planning Division, Letter to Gary Brown, #7 Exhibit G - Planning Division Staff Report on UW Master Plan, #8 Exhibit H - Letter from Douglas R. Hursch to Brian Munson, #9 Exhibit I - Letter to Douglas R. Hursch dated April 22, 2014, #10 Exhibit J - Email from Matthew Tucker, dated Oct. 26, 2018, #11 Exhibit K - Code Enforcement Worksheet produced by Inspector Jacob Moskowitz, #12 Exhibit L - Official Notice dated April 1, 2019, #13 Exhibit M - Official Notice dated May 15, 2019, #14 Exhibit N - City of Madison Site Plan Verification, #15 Exhibit O - City Electrical Permit for Madison Memorial High School, #16 Exhibit P - Nielsen Outdoor Tennis Court Expansion Documents, #17 Exhibit Q - Edgewood Appeal Application to Zoning Board of Appeals, #18 Exhibit R - Transcript of Zoning Board of Appeals Hearing (Condensed), #19 Exhibit S - Letter from City Attorney Michael P. May to Attorney Matt Lee, #20 Exhibit T - Letter from Winn Collins, ZBA Chair, dated July 18, 2019, #21 Exhibit U - Email from Administrative Clerk, #22 Exhibit V - Comparison Chart of Wisconsin Public Schools and Edgewood, #23 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #24 Summons, #25 Summons, #26 Summons, #27 Summons) (Lee, Matthew) Modified on 8/22/2019. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edgewood High School of the Sacred Heart, Inc. v. City of Madison, Wisconsin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Hank
Represented By: Barry Blonien
Represented By: Sarah Anne Zylstra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Tucker
Represented By: Barry Blonien
Represented By: Sarah Anne Zylstra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Madison Zoning Board of Appeals
Represented By: Barry Blonien
Represented By: Sarah Anne Zylstra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Madison, Wisconsin
Represented By: Barry Blonien
Represented By: Sarah Anne Zylstra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgewood High School of the Sacred Heart, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew D. Lee
Represented By: Kevin Michael LeRoy
Represented By: Noel W. Sterett
Represented By: Lawrence John Opalewski, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?