Rosneck, Karen v. Evers, Tony et al
Plaintiff: Karen Rosneck
Defendant: Ray Cross, Andrew Peterson, Joel Brennan, Tony Evers and Rebecca Blank
Case Number: 3:2019cv00702
Filed: August 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Karen Rosneck re: #5 Motion to Dismiss filed by Joel Brennan, Rebecca Blank, Ray Cross, Tony Evers, Andrew Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (jef),(ps)
October 1, 2019 Set Briefing Deadlines as to #5 MOTION TO DISMISS. Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition due 10/22/2019. Defendants' Brief in Reply due 11/1/2019. (nln),(ps)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 Brief in Support of #5 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Rebecca Blank, Joel Brennan, Ray Cross, Tony Evers, Andrew Peterson (Bensky, Anne),(ps)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS by Defendants Rebecca Blank, Joel Brennan, Ray Cross, Tony Evers, Andrew Peterson. (Bensky, Anne),(ps)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Anne Maryse Bensky for Defendants Rebecca Blank, Joel Brennan, Ray Cross, Tony Evers, Andrew Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Bensky, Anne),(ps)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summonses Returned Executed. Tony Evers served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019; Rebecca Blank served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019; Andrew Peterson served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019; Ray Cross served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019; Joel Brennan served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Rebecca Blanck, #2 Summons as to Andrew Peterson, #3 Summons as to Ray Cross, #4 Summons as to Joel Brennan) (jef),(ps)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Tony Evers, Rebecca Blank, Andrew Peterson, Ray Cross, Joel Brennan. Summonses forwarded to plaintiff for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued as to Rebecca Blank, #2 Summons issued as to Andrew Peterson, #3 Summons issued as to Ray Cross, #4 Summons issued as to Joel Brennan, #5 Procedure for Serving a Complaint on Individuals in a Federal Lawsuit, #7 Wis.Stat. 801.11) ((nln/jcf),(ps)
August 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Karen Rosneck. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 34690035222.) (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (nln),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosneck, Karen v. Evers, Tony et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Cross
Represented By: Anne Maryse Bensky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Peterson
Represented By: Anne Maryse Bensky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Brennan
Represented By: Anne Maryse Bensky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Evers
Represented By: Anne Maryse Bensky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Blank
Represented By: Anne Maryse Bensky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Rosneck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?