Rebane, Bill v. Blair, Robert et al
Plaintiff: Bill Rebane
Defendant: Blair & Associates, Ltd. and Robert Blair
Case Number: 3:2019cv00707
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 24 Reply Brief in Support of #7 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction (Reply to #21 ) by Defendants Robert Blair, Blair & Associates, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Leitner, Mark),(ps) Modified on 10/24/2019 (nln).
October 23, 2019 Filing 23 Certificate of Service filed by Plaintiff Bill Rebane re: #21 Brief in Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nln),(ps)
October 23, 2019 Filing 22 Motion for Telephonic Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment, by Plaintiff Bill Rebane. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nln),(ps)
October 15, 2019 Filing 21 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Bill Rebane re: #7 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Blair & Associates, Ltd., Robert Blair. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Letter from Law Offices of Harold C. Klaskin, #3 Envelope) (rks),(ps)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Plaintiff filed a motion seeking an extension of his October 3, 2019, deadline to respond to defendants' motion to dismiss, explaining that he is attempting to find counsel to represent him. (Dkt. #19 .) The motion is GRANTED, but I will only give him a brief extension of time, until October 21, 2019, to either oppose defendants' motion to dismiss or have his counsel file an appearance. If he does retain counsel, the court will set this matter for a telephonic scheduling conference. Defendants' Brief in Reply due 10/31/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/07/2019. (nln),(ps)
October 4, 2019 Filing 19 Motion for Extension of Time by Plaintiff Bill Rebane. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nln),(ps)
October 2, 2019 Filing 18 Sworn Statement of Bill Rebane / Exhibit D re: #15 Motion for Summary Judgment (jef),(ps)
October 2, 2019 Filing 17 Sworn Statement filed by Plaintiff Bill Rebane re: #15 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Notice of mailing, #2 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
September 27, 2019 Filing 16 Submission of New Evidence, by Plaintiff Bill Rebane. (Attachments: #1 Box Office Mojo Printout, #2 Notice of Mailing, #3 Envelope) (nln),(ps)
September 23, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Plaintiff Bill Rebane. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Letter from Atty. Harold Klaskin, 4/11/2019, #2 Notice of mailing, #3 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
September 19, 2019 Filing 14 Record from Iron County Circuit Court. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents - Notice of Removal, Summons and Complaint, etc., #2 Envelope) (nln),(ps)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #5 Motion to Admit Steven Max Harris Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 9/17/2019. (nln),(ps)
September 13, 2019 Filing 12 Criminal Complaint by Plaintiff Bill Rebane. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Iron County Sheriff's Dept. and District Attorney, 8/25/19, #2 Exhibit A - Agreement, #3 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
September 13, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT captioned to Circuit Court of Iron County, 19-cv-28, by Plaintiff Bill Rebane. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter from Atty. Klaskin, 4/11/19) (jef),(ps)
September 13, 2019 Filing 10 Objection to Removal captioned to Circuit Court of Iron County, 19-cv-28, by Plaintiff Bill Rebane. (Attachments: #1 Agreement and exhibit A, #2 Notice of mailing, #3 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
September 12, 2019 Set Briefing Deadlines as to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction . Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition due 10/3/2019. Defendants' Brief in Reply due 10/15/2019. (nln),(ps)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 Declaration of Robert Blair filed by Defendants Robert Blair, Blair & Associates, Ltd. re: #7 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Distribution Agreement) (Leitner, Mark),(ps)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 Brief in Support of #7 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Robert Blair, Blair & Associates, Ltd. (Leitner, Mark),(ps)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Robert Blair, Blair & Associates, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Leitner, Mark),(ps)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #4 Motion to Admit Steven Massey Harris Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 9/10/2019. (nln),(ps)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to Admit Steven Max Harris Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2536712.) by Defendants Robert Blair, Blair & Associates, Ltd.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Harris, Steven),(ps)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 Motion to Admit Steven Massey Harris Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2536691.) by Defendants Robert Blair, Blair & Associates, Ltd.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Harris, Steven),(ps)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Blair & Associates, Ltd., Robert Blair Exhibit 4, State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (Leitner, Mark),(ps)
August 29, 2019 Judge update in case. Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley. (jef),(ps)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Robert Blair, Blair & Associates, Ltd.. (Leitner, Mark)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Iron County, case number 19-CV-28. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2530866), filed by Robert Blair, Blair & Associates, Ltd., (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Distribution Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Robert Blair (Not filed separately.), #4 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Leitner, Mark) Modified on 8/30/2019: Certificate of Service? (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rebane, Bill v. Blair, Robert et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blair & Associates, Ltd.
Represented By: Mark M. Leitner
Represented By: Steven Max Harris
Represented By: Steven Massey Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Blair
Represented By: Mark M. Leitner
Represented By: Steven Max Harris
Represented By: Steven Massey Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Rebane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?