Standard Process Inc. v. Levy, Danny et al
Plaintiff: Standard Process Inc.
Defendant: John Does 1-100 and Danny Levy
Case Number: 3:2019cv00709
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Reissued as to Defendant Danny Levy. (kwf)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by William D Kloss, Jr., for Plaintiff Standard Process Inc. (Kloss, William)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Katherine Greiner Barnes for Plaintiff Standard Process Inc. (Barnes, Katherine)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Standard Process Inc. (Barnes, Katherine)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Danny Levy. (kwf)
September 3, 2019 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (kwf)
September 3, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2531588.), filed by Standard Process Inc., (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Maher, Ann) Modified on 8/30/2019. (lak)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Standard Process Inc. (Maher, Ann)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Standard Process Inc. v. Levy, Danny et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Standard Process Inc.
Represented By: Ann M. Maher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?