Gibson, Cielo v. Midrad, LLC
Plaintiff: Cielo Jean Gibson
Defendant: Midrad, LLC, Silks Exotic Madison and Silk Exotic Gentlemen
Case Number: 3:2019cv00712
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Filing 6 Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Aronowitz, Edmund)
October 4, 2019 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 11/7/2019 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jls)
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendant Midrad, LLC. (Nichols, Jeffrey)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Jeffrey T. Nichols for Defendant Midrad, LLC. (Nichols, Jeffrey)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Midrad, LLC served on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Aronowitz, Edmund)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Midrad, LLC. (voc)
September 3, 2019 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (voc)
September 3, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (voc)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Midrad, LLC, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2531651.), filed by Cielo Jean Gibson, (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Aronowitz, Edmund)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibson, Cielo v. Midrad, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midrad, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silks Exotic Madison
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silk Exotic Gentlemen
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cielo Jean Gibson
Represented By: Edmund Samuel Aronowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?