Robson, Tammie v. Saul, Andrew
Plaintiff: Tammie Robson
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2019cv00717
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Andrew Saul served on 9/10/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Duncan, Dana)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **This court's new general practice is to schedule social security cases for oral argument. To facilitate scheduling, the parties must file a joint notice stating their availability for oral argument. The notice must be filed within 10 days after plaintiff submits a reply brief (or within 10 days after the reply deadline if plaintiff does not file a reply) and the notice must identify three dates on which the parties would be available. After plaintiff's reply brief is due, the parties should consult and propose dates in May of 2020 for oral argument; the court prefers Thursdays or Fridays at 10:00 AM. If the parties have good cause for not being available on three days within the required window, then they may request a different date. After the parties file their notice, the court will notify them if and when it intends to hold oral argument. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 10/8/2019. (arw)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. Materials returned to plaintiff counsel for service. (jat)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** From the affidavit of indigency plaintiff has submitted, I find that plaintiff is unable to prepay the fees and costs of commencing this action or to give security therefor. Accordingly, plaintiff's petition for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee is granted. The clerk of court shall issue summonses and forward them to plaintiff's counsel for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 9/5/19. (jat)
September 5, 2019 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jat)
September 5, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer. (jat)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Tammie Robson. (Duncan, Dana)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Tammie Robson, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (Duncan, Dana) Modified on 9/4/2019. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robson, Tammie v. Saul, Andrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammie Robson
Represented By: Dana W. Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?