Otto, Michele v. Saul, Andrew
Plaintiff: Michele Otto
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2019cv00726
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Barbara B Crabb
Referring Judge: Peter A Oppeneer
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Andrew Saul served on 9/13/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (lak)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 Disregard. Modified on 10/7/2019. (lak)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. Materials returned to plaintiff counsel for service. (jat)
September 5, 2019 Standard attachments for Judge Barbara B. Crabb required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (jat)
September 5, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb and Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer. (jat)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul. Service to be completed by Waiver of Service of Summons. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2534187.) Filed by Michele Otto, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - United States Attorney's office, #3 Summons - Attorney General, #4 Summons - Andrew Saul) (Lein, Curtiss) Modified on 9/5/2019: Last page of complaint is blank. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Otto, Michele v. Saul, Andrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Barbara L Oswald
Represented By: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Otto
Represented By: Curtiss Norman Lein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?