Steers, Allison v. DF Institute, LLC
Plaintiff: Allison Steers
Defendant: DF Institute, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00739
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #32 Motion to Admit Samuel Mogensen Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 5/12/2020. (lak)
May 12, 2020 Filing 32 Motion to Admit Samuel Mogensen Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2676394.) by Defendant DF Institute, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Mogensen, Samuel)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **On May 8, 2020, the parties filed a stipulation to resolve their current disputes over discovery and a protective order (dkt. #29 ) along with a stipulated proposed protective order (dkt. #30 -1). The court accepts the parties' discovery stipulation and deems withdrawn the competing motion to compel (dkt. #12 ) and motion for protection (dkt. #20 ). The court also accepts the parties' jointly-proposed protective order and enters it as the court's order. The court commends counsel on both sides for having successfully negotiated this resolution. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/11/2020. (kwf)
May 8, 2020 Filing 30 Stipulated Motion for Protective Order by Defendant DF Institute, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Syring-Petrocchi, Tina) Modified on 5/8/2020. (lak).
May 8, 2020 Filing 29 Stipulation to Resolve Pending Motion for Protective Order and Further Discovery Issues by Defendant DF Institute, LLC. (Syring-Petrocchi, Tina) Modified on 5/8/2020. (lak)
May 7, 2020 Filing 28 Declaration of Caitlin M. Madden filed by Plaintiff Allison Steers re: #20 Motion for Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - February 24, 2020 Email) (Madden, Caitlin)
May 7, 2020 Filing 27 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Allison Steers re: #20 Motion for Protective Order filed by DF Institute, LLC (Madden, Caitlin)
April 30, 2020 Set/Reset Briefing Deadlines as to #20 Motion for Protective Order. Brief in Opposition due 5/7/2020. (kwf)
April 30, 2020 Filing 26 Exhibit to #21 Brief in Support filed by DF Institute, LLC Proposed Protective Order (Syring-Petrocchi, Tina)
April 29, 2020 Filing 25 Declaration of James Mackey filed by Defendant DF Institute, LLC CORRECTED EXHIBIT A - Protective Order - in Support of Opposition to Motion to Compel re: 16 Text Only Order,,,,,, (Syring-Petrocchi, Tina)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **About 4 and 1/2 hours after learning that they had missed their response deadline on plaintiff's motion to compel (and therefore had lost the motion), defendant's attorneys filed a late response along with their explanation for what happened. Although counsel's tone is more entitled than entreating, the court will accept the late opposition and decide plaintiff's motion on its merits. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/29/2020. (arw)
April 29, 2020 Filing 23 Declaration of James Mackey filed by Defendant DF Institute, LLC in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel re: 16 Text Only Order,,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Protective Order, #2 Exhibit B - 2/12/20 Email from Behm, #3 Exhibit C - 2/24/20 Email from Madden, #4 Exhibit D - 3/3-5/20 Email Exchange, #5 Exhibit E - 3/5-11/20 Email Exchange, #6 Exhibit F - 3/11-12/20 Email Exchange, #7 Exhibit G - 4/2/20 Email Exchange) (Syring-Petrocchi, Tina)
April 29, 2020 Filing 22 Declaration of James Mackey filed by Defendant DF Institute, LLC re: #20 Motion for Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Syring-Petrocchi, Tina)
April 29, 2020 Filing 21 Brief in Support of #20 Motion for Protective Order by Defendant DF Institute, LLC (Syring-Petrocchi, Tina)
April 29, 2020 Filing 20 Motion for Protective Order by Defendant DF Institute, LLC. (Syring-Petrocchi, Tina)
April 29, 2020 Filing 19 Disregard. Modified on 4/30/2020. (lak)
April 29, 2020 Filing 18 Declaration of Tina Syring-Petrocchi filed by Defendant DF Institute, LLC in Support of Opposition to Motion to Compel re: 16 Text Only Order,,,,,, (Syring-Petrocchi, Tina)
April 29, 2020 Filing 17 Brief in Opposition by Defendant DF Institute, LLC re: #12 Motion to Compel. (Syring-Petrocchi, Tina) Modified on 4/29/2020. (lak)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **On April 28, 2020, the parties filed a joint stipulation to modify the schedule due to the impact of the coronavirus. Dkt. #15 . Like the parties, this court is complying with all orders and directives issued by Governor Evers and the State of Wisconsin. Within those constraints, and within the constraints of safety and avoiding undue burden, this court is requiring all parties and attorneys to continue to pursue discovery and motions practice in their civil cases. Zoom depositions and other electronic workarounds have become the new normal, and the court is granting measured extensions to account for the friction generated by proceeding in this fashion. It appears that the parties in this case are proceeding accordingly, so the court will give them as much of an extension of the summary judgment motion deadline as the schedule affords. In this case, that's three weeks. The new motion filing deadline is June 26, 2020. With a firm November 2, 2020 trial date, the parties should not expect another extension of this deadline. Finally, in an unrelated matter, on April 20, 2020, plaintiff filed a motion to compel discovery along with supporting documents. See dkts. #12 - #14 . Defendant's response was due April 27, 2020. It is now April 29, 2020 and defendant has filed nothing. Therefore, plaintiff's motion to compel is GRANTED as unopposed. Pursuant to Rule 37(a)(5)(A), plaintiff may have until May 6, 2020 to submit her itemized bill of expenses on this motion, with defendant's response to the reasonableness of the amount claimed due by May 13, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/29/2020. (kwf)
April 28, 2020 Filing 15 Joint Stipulation to Modify Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order by Defendant DF Institute, LLC. (Syring-Petrocchi, Tina)
April 20, 2020 Filing 14 Declaration of Caitlin M. Madden filed by Plaintiff Allison Steers re: #12 Motion to Compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Defendant's Proposed Protective Order, #3 Exhibit C - February 24, 2020 Email, #4 Exhibit D - March 2, 2020 Email Exchange, #5 Exhibit E - March 5, 2020 Email, #6 Exhibit F - March 10, 2020 Email Exchange, #7 Exhibit G - March 12, 2020 and March 26, 2020 Emails, #8 Exhibit H - March 30, 2020, March 31, 2020 and April 2, 2020 Email Exchange) (Madden, Caitlin)
April 20, 2020 Filing 13 Brief in Support of #12 Motion to Compel Discovery by Plaintiff Allison Steers (Madden, Caitlin)
April 20, 2020 Filing 12 Motion to Compel Discovery by Plaintiff Allison Steers. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 4/27/2020. (Madden, Caitlin)
December 20, 2019 Filing 11 Rule 26 Initial Disclosure Report by Defendant DF Institute, LLC. (Syring-Petrocchi, Tina)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson attached. Amendments to Pleadings due 12/20/2019. Dispositive Motions due 6/5/2020. Settlement Letters due 9/25/2020. Motions in Limine due 10/2/2020. Response to Motion due 10/16/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/28/2020 at 04:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 11/2/2020 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/25/2019. (jls)
November 20, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 11/20/2019 [:10] (skv)
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Fairweather, Nicholas)
October 17, 2019 Case randomly reassigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #7 Motion to Admit James Daniel Mackey Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 10/15/2019. (lak)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to Admit James Daniel Mackey Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2558725.) by Defendant DF Institute, LLC. (Mackey, James)
October 15, 2019 Action Requested: If you have not already provided your #Consent to Magistrate/Request for Reassignment form, please do so by 11/6/2019. (kwf)
October 15, 2019 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 11/20/2019 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (kwf)
October 14, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant DF Institute, LLC. (Syring-Petrocchi, Tina)
October 14, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER by Defendant DF Institute, LLC. (Syring-Petrocchi, Tina) Modified on 10/15/2019: Page 10 is blank. (lak)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Tina Anne Syring-Petrocchi for Defendant DF Institute, LLC. (Syring-Petrocchi, Tina)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. DF Institute, LLC served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Fairweather, Nicholas)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to DF Institute, LLC. (kwf)
September 11, 2019 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (kwf)
September 11, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DF Institute, LLC, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2536153.), filed by Allison Steers, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Fairweather, Nicholas) Modified on 9/9/2019. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steers, Allison v. DF Institute, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DF Institute, LLC
Represented By: Tina Anne Syring-Petrocchi
Represented By: James Daniel Mackey
Represented By: Samuel Mogensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Steers
Represented By: Caitlin Marie Madden
Represented By: Nicholas E. Fairweather
Represented By: Lili Clare Behm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?