Van Gorp, Allison v. Walmart Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Allison Van Gorp
Defendant: Walmart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00740
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 11/21/2019 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (kwf)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #12 Motion to Admit Scott Alan Forman Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 10/18/2019. (lak)
October 17, 2019 Filing 12 Motion to Admit Scott Alan Forman Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2560567.) by Defendant Walmart Stores, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Forman, Scott)
October 17, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Walmart Stores, Inc. (Anderson, Sofija)
October 17, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER by Defendant Walmart Stores, Inc. (Anderson, Sofija)
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Michael S. Yellin for Defendant Walmart Stores, Inc. (Yellin, Michael)
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Sofija Anderson for Defendant Walmart Stores, Inc. (Anderson, Sofija) Modified on 10/18/2019. (lak)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Lindsey Krause for Plaintiff Allison Van Gorp. (Krause, Lindsey)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #4 Motion to Admit Lindsey Krause Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 10/16/2019. (lak)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by James Kaster for Plaintiff Allison Van Gorp. (Kaster, James)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 Motion to Admit Lindsey Krause Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2559165.) by Plaintiff Allison Van Gorp. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Krause, Lindsey)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Returned Executed. Walmart Stores, Inc. served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019. (Kaster, Lucas)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Walmart Stores, Inc. (kwf)
September 10, 2019 Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf)
September 10, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Walmart Stores, Inc., ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2536139.), filed by Allison Van Gorp, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Kaster, Lucas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Gorp, Allison v. Walmart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Van Gorp
Represented By: Lucas Kaster
Represented By: Lindsey Krause
Represented By: James Kaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Alan Forman
Represented By: Michael S Yellin
Represented By: Sofija Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?