Kreger-Mueller, Valerie v. Withee, Daniel et al
Plaintiff: Valerie Kreger-Mueller
Defendant: Ryan Roettger, Michael Ash, Tyler Loether, Scott Moen, Terry Hanson, Daniel Withee, Jill Tutaj, Nicholas Stroik, Nick Stroik, Darren Zimmerman, Steven Ziegler, Julie Carbon, Chuck Foulke, Costin Turnureanu, David Kasdorf, Benjamin Engstrom, Kenneth Smith, Dan Jones, Gregory Dixon, Robert Maier, Jesse Sellek, Howard Statz, Matthew Jacobs and Jesus Gama
Case Number: 3:2019cv00741
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 18 Certificate of Service by Defendants Robert Maier, Howard Statz, Daniel Withee as to #17 Answer. (Baynard, Jasmyne),(ps)
October 30, 2019 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 11/21/2019 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Plaintiff responsible for contacting the court at (608) 264-5153. Once plaintiff's call has been received, the court will then include counsel for defendant in the conference call. [#Notice Regarding the Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (nln),(ps)
October 30, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER by Defendants Robert Maier, Howard Statz, Daniel Withee. (Baynard, Jasmyne),(ps)
October 16, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Robert Maier, Howard Statz, Daniel Withee. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Baynard, Jasmyne),(ps)
October 16, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance filed by Jasmyne Mariah Baynard for Defendants Robert Maier, Howard Statz, Daniel Withee. (Baynard, Jasmyne),(ps)
October 16, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance filed by Ann C. Wirth for Defendants Robert Maier, Howard Statz, Daniel Withee. (Wirth, Ann),(ps)
October 16, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance filed by John A. Wolfgang for Defendants Robert Maier, Howard Statz, Daniel Withee. (Wolfgang, John),(ps)
October 16, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance filed by Gregg J. Gunta for Defendants Robert Maier, Howard Statz, Daniel Withee. (Gunta, Gregg),(ps)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #6 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 10/15/2019. (jef),(ps)
October 10, 2019 Filing 10 Marshal Service Return Executed. Daniel Withee served on 10/10/2019, answer due 10/31/2019; Robert Maier served on 10/10/2019, answer due 10/31/2019; Howard Statz served on 10/10/2019, answer due 10/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 USMS from as to Robert Maier, #2 USMS from as to Howard Statz) (jef),(ps)
September 30, 2019 USCA Case Number 19-2880 for #7 Notice of Appeal filed by Valerie Kreger-Mueller. (jef),(ps)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Docket Sheet and Judgment to Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals re #7 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Order, dkt, #4 entered on Sept. 25, 2019, #2 Docket sheet) (jef),(ps)
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 Appeal Information Packet. (jef),(ps)
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEAL - INTERLOCUTORY by Plaintiff Valerie Kreger-Mueller as to #4 Order. In forma pauperis previously granted. No Docketing Statement filed. (jef),(ps)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 Motion for Reconsideration re #4 Order by Plaintiff Valerie Kreger-Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 Summonses Issued as to Daniel Withee, et al. Forwarded to U.S. Marshals for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Robert Maier, #2 Summons as to Howard Statz) (jef),(ps)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER on Leave to Proceed: Plaintiff granted leave to proceed against Defendants Robert Maier, Howard Statz, Daniel Withee. Leave to proceed denied and case dismissed against Julie Carbon, Gregory Dixon, Benjamin Engstrom, Chuck Foulke, Jesus Gama, Terry Hanson, Matthew Jacobs, Dan Jones, David Kasdorf, Tyler Loether, Scott Moen, Ryan Roettger, Jesse Sellek, Kenneth Smith, Nicholas Stroik, Nick Stroik, Costin Turnureanu, Jill Tutaj, Steven Ziegler, Darren Zimmerman, Michael Ash and Michael Ash. Service to be made by USMS. Plaintiff's motion for injunctive relief, Dkt. #2 , is DENIED without prejudice. The clerk of court is directed to send Kreger-Mueller this court's procedures for filing motions for injunctive relief. Plaintiff's motion to seal, Dkt. #3 , is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 9/25/2019. (jef),(ps) Clerk's office note: mailed PI procedures to plaintiff. Modified on 9/25/2019 (jef).
September 9, 2019 Motion for In Forma Pauperis Screening (ifp granted dkt. 22, case 18-cv-708 order). (jef),(ps)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 Motion to Seal by Plaintiff Valerie Kreger-Mueller. (jef),(ps)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION FOR INJUNCTION by Plaintiff Valerie Kreger-Mueller. (jef),(ps)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Valerie Kreger-Mueller. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (jef),(ps) Same as amended complaint, dkt. 13 case 18-cv-708, per dkt. 22 order in that case. (jef) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/24/2019: #1 Order from case 18-cv-708-jdp, dkt. 22) (jef).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kreger-Mueller, Valerie v. Withee, Daniel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Roettger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Ash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Loether
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Moen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Withee
Represented By: John A. Wolfgang
Represented By: Ann C. Wirth
Represented By: Jasmyne Mariah Baynard
Represented By: Gregg J. Gunta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Tutaj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Stroik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Stroik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Ziegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Carbon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck Foulke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costin Turnureanu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Kasdorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Engstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Maier
Represented By: John A. Wolfgang
Represented By: Ann C. Wirth
Represented By: Jasmyne Mariah Baynard
Represented By: Gregg J. Gunta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Sellek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Statz
Represented By: John A. Wolfgang
Represented By: Ann C. Wirth
Represented By: Jasmyne Mariah Baynard
Represented By: Gregg J. Gunta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesus Gama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Kreger-Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?