Pack, Shannon v. Saul, Andrew
Defendant: Andrew Saul and Shannon Pack
Case Number: 3:2019cv00744
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Jean Godfrey for Defendant Andrew Saul. (Godfrey, Jean)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Andrew Saul served on 9/24/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (lak)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 Disregard. Modified on 10/2/2019. (lak)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 Disregard. Modified on 10/2/2019. (lak)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. Materials returned to plaintiff counsel for service. (jls)
September 10, 2019 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jls)
September 10, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer. (jls)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2536417.), filed by Shannon Pack, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Lindsey, Max) Modified on 9/10/2019: Corrected parties; removed addresses; complaint and summons are missing case number; civil cover sheet is unsigned. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pack, Shannon v. Saul, Andrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Pack
Represented By: Max Thomas Lindsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?