United States of America v. Sivertson, Eric et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Affinity Plus Federal Credit Union, Cathy Ann Bross, Sawyer County, WI, Wisconsin Department of Revenue and Eric W. Sivertson
Case Number: 3:2019cv00745
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Sawyer County, WI. (Shafer, Quentin)
November 8, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER, CROSSCLAIM against Eric W. Sivertson, Affinity Plus Federal Credit Union, Cathy Ann Bross, Wisconsin Department of Revenue, COUNTERCLAIM against United States of America by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sawyer County's Real Estate Tax Statement) (Shafer, Quentin)
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER by Defendant Affinity Plus Federal Credit Union, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Mortgage on Real Estate) (Running, Terri)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Returned Executed. Eric W. Sivertson served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Smith, Casey)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Wisconsin Department of Revenue. Wisconsin Department of Revenue waiver sent on 9/19/2019, answer due 11/19/2019. (Smith, Casey) Modified on 10/11/2019. (lak)
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Affinity Plus Federal Credit Union. Affinity Plus Federal Credit Union waiver sent on 9/12/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Smith, Casey)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Cathy Ann Bross. Cathy Ann Bross waiver sent on 9/12/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Smith, Casey)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Sawyer County, WI. Sawyer County, WI waiver sent on 9/12/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Smith, Casey)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Affinity Plus Federal Credit Union, Cathy Ann Bross, Sawyer County, WI, Eric W. Sivertson, Wisconsin Department of Revenue. (jat)
September 11, 2019 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jat)
September 11, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jat)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Affinity Plus Federal Credit Union, Cathy Ann Bross, Sawyer County, WI, Eric W. Sivertson, Wisconsin Department of Revenue. Service to be completed by Waiver of Service of Summons. Filed by United States of America, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Eric W. Sivertson, #3 Summons - Cathy Ann Bross, #4 Summons - Sawyer County, WI, #5 Summons - Affinity Plus Federal Credit Union, #6 Summons - Wisconsin Department of Revenue) (Smith, Casey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Sivertson, Eric et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affinity Plus Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Terri Running
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy Ann Bross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sawyer County, WI
Represented By: Quentin Fitch Shafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wisconsin Department of Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric W. Sivertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Casey Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?