United States of America v. Shilts, Edward et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Chippewa County, Wisconsin, Central Builders Supply, Inc., Edward Ray Shilts, Superior Choice Credit Union, Christianson & Freund, LLC, Lynn Marie Shilts and Smith Feed Service, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00748
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Lynn Marie Shilts. Lynn Marie Shilts waiver sent on 9/12/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Oswald, Barbara)
October 24, 2019 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Edward Ray Shilts. Edward Ray Shilts waiver sent on 9/12/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Oswald, Barbara)
October 23, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER by Defendant Chippewa County, Wisconsin, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Promissory Note and Mortgage) (Pauls, Todd) Modified on 10/24/2019. (lak)
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Chippewa County, Wisconsin. Chippewa County, Wisconsin waiver sent on 9/12/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Oswald, Barbara)
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Superior Choice Credit Union. Superior Choice Credit Union waiver sent on 9/12/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Oswald, Barbara)
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER by Defendant Superior Choice Credit Union, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agricultural Universal Note - 7-12-18, #2 Exhibit B - Real Estate Mortgage - Document No. 699943 - 1-21-2005, #3 Exhibit C - Real Estate Mortgage - Document No. 705452 - 6-8-2005) (Jones, Parrish)
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 Disregard. Refer to #8 . Modified on 10/1/2019. (lak)
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Parrish James Rogers Jones for Defendant Superior Choice Credit Union. (Jones, Parrish)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Central Builders Supply, Inc. Central Builders Supply, Inc. waiver sent on 9/12/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Oswald, Barbara)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Christianson & Freund, LLC. Christianson & Freund, LLC waiver sent on 9/12/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Oswald, Barbara)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Smith Feed Service, Inc. Smith Feed Service, Inc. waiver sent on 9/12/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Oswald, Barbara)
September 12, 2019 Standard attachments for District Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Notice to Creditors. (kwf)
September 12, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Lis Pendens by Plaintiff United States of America (Oswald, Barbara)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - 07.15.2014 Promissory Note, #3 Exhibit B - 12.03.2008 Promissory Note, #4 Exhibit C - 07.22.2014 Mortgage, #5 Exhibit D - 06.10.2013 Mortgage, #6 Exhibit E - 12.05.2008 Mortgage, #7 Exhibit F - Notice of Acceleration) (Oswald, Barbara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Shilts, Edward et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chippewa County, Wisconsin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Builders Supply, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Ray Shilts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Choice Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christianson & Freund, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Marie Shilts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Feed Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Barbara L Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?