Rachuy v. USA
Petitioner: Gale A. Rachuy
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00749
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 USCA Case Number 19-3065 for #5 Notice of Appeal, filed by Gale A. Rachuy. (kwf)
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Docketing Statement, Docket Sheet and Judgment to Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals re #5 Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: #1 Docketing Statement, #2 Dkt. No. 3- Order, #3 Dkt. No. 4 Judgment, #4 Docket Sheet, #5 Envelope) (voc)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 Appeal Information Packet. (voc)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Petitioner Gale A. Rachuy as to #4 Judgment, #3 Order on Motion to Vacate Sentence per 28 USC 2255. In forma pauperis pending. Docketing Statement filed. (Attachments: #1 Docketing Statement, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Envelope) (voc)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 JUDGMENT entered denying 2255 motion. (voc)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #1 Motion to Vacate Sentence per 28 USC 2255. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 9/25/2019. (voc)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 Notice/Addendum by Petitioner Gale A. Rachuy re #1 Motion to Vacate Sentence per 28 U.S.C. 2255. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (voc)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 Motion to Vacate Sentence per 28 U.S.C. 2255. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (voc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rachuy v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Aaron Wegner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gale A. Rachuy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?