Johnson v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Natalie Johnson
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2019cv00760
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Filing 20 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated re: #19 Motion to Compel or Enforce the Scheduling Order filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Helm, Catherine)
December 30, 2019 Filing 19 Motion to Compel or Enforce the Scheduling Order by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 1/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - E-mail dated 12/16/2019, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Helm, Catherine) Modified on 12/31/2019: Added exhibit description. E-mail sent to counsel. (lak)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge William M. Conley attached. Dispositive Motions and Daubert Motions due 10/30/2020. Settlement Letters due 4/30/2021. Motions in Limine due 4/30/2021. Responses due 5/14/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/5/2021 at 4:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 6/7/2021 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/15/2019. (kwf)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** At the parties' joint request (see dkt. #16 ), this court adopts as its own these orders entered during MDL proceedings in the District of Arizona: Stipulated Protective Order; Case Management Order (CMO) #7; CMO #12; and CMO #17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/14/2019. (kwf)
November 14, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 11/14/2019 [:20] (skv)
November 12, 2019 Filing 16 Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulated Protective Order, #2 Exhibit B - Case Management Order #7, #3 Exhibit C - Amended Case Management Order #17, #4 Exhibit D - Case Management Order #12) (Helm, Catherine) Modified on 11/13/2019. (lak)
November 8, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance filed by John Anthony Dalimonte for Plaintiff Natalie Johnson. (Dalimonte, John)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **The court will hold a telephonic scheduling conference on November 14, 2019 at 3:00 PM at which it will set a firm trial date. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. Not later than November 12, 2019, the parties jointly are to report how much time they need to complete their case-specific discovery, the predicted length of the trial, and any other consideration relevant to picking a trial date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/5/2019. (arw)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #11 Motion to Admit Elizabeth Catherine Helm Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 10/1/2019. (lak)
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 Status Report of the Parties Regarding Issues Remaining To Be Resolved by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Faught, Catherine)
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 Motion to Admit Catherine Helm Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2550164.) by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Helm, Catherine)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated. (Faught, Catherine)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant C R Bard Incorporated. (Faught, Catherine)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Travis Evan Romero-Boeck for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Romero-Boeck, Travis)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Catherine A. Faught for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Faught, Catherine) Modified on 9/17/2019: E-mail sent to counsel in case 19-cv-759. (lak)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **On September 13, 2019, this court received four Suggestion of Remand and Transfer Orders entered by the District of Arizona in the In Re: Bard IVC Filters Products Liability Litigation, MDL 15-02641. This court cannot accurately discern the status of these cases from the transferring district's docket sheet or zip files. The court would benefit from counsel's input before determining how best to approach these remands. Therefore, not later than September 30, 2019, the parties in each of these cases are to submit a joint status report briefly explaining what already has occurred with these cases in Arizona and what remains to be done in the Western District of Wisconsin. As a heads-up, this court might end up asking the parties to cull from the Arizona docket the documents relevant to each of these four cases for entry into this court's docket, but first we need the status reports. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/16/2019. (arw)
September 13, 2019 Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (arw)
September 13, 2019 Case directly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-00936. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (arw)
September 12, 2019 Remark: Transferring Case to the Western District of Wisconsin via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/13/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED Re: #3 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/13/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/13/2019.]
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-00936-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/13/2019.]
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16527556 filed by Natalie Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/13/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Julie A. North
Represented By: Travis Evan Romero-Boeck
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Catherine Helm
Represented By: Catherine A. Faught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Julie A. North
Represented By: Travis Evan Romero-Boeck
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Catherine Helm
Represented By: Catherine A. Faught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Johnson
Represented By: Thomas William Arbon
Represented By: John Anthony Dalimonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?