Greystone Condominium at Blackhawks Owners Association, Inc. v. AmGUARD Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Greystone Condominium at Blackhawks Owners Association, Inc.
Defendant: AmGUARD Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00768
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge Stephen L. Crocker attached. Amendments to Pleadings due 1/31/2020. Dispositive Motions due 8/14/2020. Settlement Letters due 11/20/2020. Motions in Limine due 12/4/2020. Responses due 12/18/2020. Final Pretrial Submissions due 12/14/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/6/2021 at 3:00 PM. Court Trial set for 1/11/2021 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/30/2019. (kwf)
October 30, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 10/28/2019 [:15] (cak)
October 18, 2019 Reset Hearings: Telephone Pretrial Conference reset from 10/22/2019 to 10/28/2019 at 1:30 PM to accommodate the court's calendar. Counsel for plaintiff remains responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153 (kwf)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Plaintiff Greystone Condominium at Blackhawks Owners Association, Inc. (Scott, Kevin) Modified on 10/18/2019. (lak)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 10/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent - Plaintiff, #2 Consent - Defendant) (lak)
September 23, 2019 Action Requested: If you have not already provided your #Consent to Magistrate/Request for Reassignment form, please do so by 10/8/2019. (kwf)
September 23, 2019 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 10/22/2019 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (kwf)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER by Defendant AmGUARD Insurance Company. (Jacobson, Craig)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 Record from Dane County Circuit Court. (kwf)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Craig Jacobson for Defendant AmGUARD Insurance Company, (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Jacobson, Craig)
September 16, 2019 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (kwf)
September 16, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant AmGUARD Insurance Company. (Brown, Ryan)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Dane County, Case Number 2019CV002215, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2539743), filed by AmGUARD Insurance Company, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Service of Process Transmittal, Electronic Filing Notice, Summons, Complaint, Additional Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Greystone Corporate Records, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Docket Sheet, #4 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Brown, Ryan) Modified on 9/15/2019: Added counsel for plaintiff, etc. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greystone Condominium at Blackhawks Owners Association, Inc. v. AmGUARD Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmGUARD Insurance Company
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Brown
Represented By: Craig Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greystone Condominium at Blackhawks Owners Association, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin M. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?