MM Education LLC et al v. Barnhardt, Todd et al
Plaintiff: Yaseen Jaffer, Mohamed Jaffer and MM Education LLC
Defendant: Nousha Sabet, Todd Barnhardt, LMLC Franchising, LLC and LMLC Management, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00824
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 Status Report Regarding Service of Defendants by Plaintiffs Mohamed Jaffer, Yaseen Jaffer, MM Education LLC. (Patel, Pimal)
November 19, 2019 Action Requested: Counsel for plaintiff requested to promptly file proof of service. (jls)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Todd Barnhardt, LMLC Franchising, LLC, LMLC Management, LLC, and Nousha Sabet. (jls)
October 4, 2019 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (jls)
October 4, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2552525.), filed by All Plaintiffs, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Franchise Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Franchise Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Management Agreement, #4 Exhibit 4 - Management Agreement, #5 Exhibit 5 - MM Education LLC - Missouri City Site Business Plan, #6 Exhibit 6 - MM Education LLC - Katy Site Business Plan, #7 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons - Todd Barnhardt, #9 Summons - Nousha Sabet, #10 Summons - LMLC Management, LLC, #11 Summons - LMLC Franchising, LLC) (Patel, Pimal) Modified on 10/4/2019: Added exhibit descriptions. Case number. E-mail sent to counsel. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MM Education LLC et al v. Barnhardt, Todd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yaseen Jaffer
Represented By: Pimal Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohamed Jaffer
Represented By: Pimal Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MM Education LLC
Represented By: Pimal Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nousha Sabet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Barnhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LMLC Franchising, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LMLC Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?