Loraas, Gabriel v. The Climate Corporation
Plaintiff: Gabriel Loraas
Defendant: The Climate Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv00825
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** ORDER accepting #6 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Answer due 1/8/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/21/2019. (rks)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by Plaintiff Gabriel Loraas. (Walcheske, James)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. The Climate Corporation served on 11/5/2019, answer due 11/26/2019. (Walcheske, James)
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to The Climate Corporation. (voc)
October 7, 2019 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (voc)
October 7, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (voc)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by James A. Walcheske for Plaintiff Gabriel Loraas. (Walcheske, James)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Scott Stanton Luzi for Plaintiff Gabriel Loraas. (Luzi, Scott)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Climate Corporation, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2552789.), filed by Gabriel Loraas, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Gabriel Loraas Consent to Join Form) (Luzi, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loraas, Gabriel v. The Climate Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Climate Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Loraas
Represented By: James A. Walcheske
Represented By: Scott Stanton Luzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?