United States of America v. Meyer, Joseph et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Gene Odegard, Morgan Schmidt, La Crosse County, Wisconsin, Jessica Baumann, State of Wisconsin, Wisconsin Department of Revenue, Joseph D. Meyer, Geoffrey Baumann, Michael Schmidt and Associated Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00830
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Barbara B Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Filing 21 Clerk's Entry of Default as to Defendant Gene Odegard. (nln),(ps)
December 3, 2019 Filing 20 Clerk's Entry of Default as to Associated Bank, N.A. (nln),(ps)
December 3, 2019 Filing 19 Exhibit to #14 Declaration filed by United States of America, (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Taylor-Phillips, LaQuita),(ps) Modified on 12/4/2019. (lak)
December 2, 2019 Reset Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference rescheduled to 1/22/2020 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Government remains responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Notice Regarding the Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (nln),(ps)
December 2, 2019 Filing 18 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant La Crosse County, Wisconsin. La Crosse County, Wisconsin waiver sent on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020. (Taylor-Phillips, LaQuita),(ps)
December 2, 2019 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 1/8/2020 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Government responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Notice Regarding the Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (rks),(ps)
November 26, 2019 Filing 17 Certificate of Service by Plaintiff United States of America as to #13 Motion for Entry of Default as to Gene Odegard, #14 Declaration, #15 Motion for Entry of Default as to Associated Bank, N.A., #16 Declaration. (Taylor-Phillips, LaQuita),(ps)
November 21, 2019 Filing 16 Declaration of LaQuita Taylor-Phillips filed by Plaintiff United States of America re: #15 Motion for Entry of Default (Taylor-Phillips, LaQuita),(ps)
November 21, 2019 Filing 15 Motion for Entry of Default as to Associated Bank, N.A. by United States of America. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Taylor-Phillips, LaQuita),(ps) Modified on 11/22/2019. (lak)
November 21, 2019 Filing 14 Declaration of LaQuita Taylor-Phillips filed by Plaintiff United States of America re: #13 Motion for Entry of Default (Taylor-Phillips, LaQuita),(ps)
November 21, 2019 Filing 13 Motion for Entry of Default as to Gene Odegard by United States of America. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Taylor-Phillips, LaQuita),(ps) Modified on 11/22/2019. (lak)
November 18, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendant Joseph D. Meyer. (kwf)
November 13, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER by Defendants Geoffrey Baumann, Jessica Baumann. (Waterstreet, Derek)
November 13, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Derek John Waterstreet for Defendants Geoffrey Baumann, Jessica Baumann. (Waterstreet, Derek)
November 6, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Returned Executed. Associated Bank, N.A. served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Taylor-Phillips, LaQuita)
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER by Defendants Michael Schmidt, Morgan Schmidt. (Weber, Brian)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Returned Executed. Gene Odegard served on 10/22/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Taylor-Phillips, LaQuita)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Returned Executed. Joseph D. Meyer served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019. (Taylor-Phillips, LaQuita)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER by Defendant State of Wisconsin, Wisconsin Department of Revenue, (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (McNeilly, James)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Reissued as to Defendants Gene Odegard, Michael Schmidt, Morgan Schmidt. (kwf)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff United States of America, (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (Taylor-Phillips, LaQuita)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Associated Bank, N.A., Geoffrey Baumann, Jessica Baumann, La Crosse County, Wisconsin, Joseph D. Meyer, Gene Odegard, Michael Schmidt, Morgan Schmidt, State of Wisconsin, Wisconsin Department of Revenue. (kwf)
October 8, 2019 Standard attachments for District Judge Barbara B. Crabb required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (kwf)
October 8, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons) (Taylor-Phillips, LaQuita) Modified on 10/7/2019: Defendant Geoffrey Baumann spelled Bauman in the caption of the complaint. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Meyer, Joseph et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gene Odegard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Schmidt
Represented By: Brian G. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Crosse County, Wisconsin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Baumann
Represented By: Derek John Waterstreet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Wisconsin, Wisconsin Department of Revenue
Represented By: James W. McNeilly, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph D. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geoffrey Baumann
Represented By: Derek John Waterstreet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Schmidt
Represented By: Brian G. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: LaQuita Joy Taylor-Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?