Neeck, Connor et al v. Badger Brothers Moving LLC
Plaintiff: Connor Neeck and Isaiah West
Defendant: Badger Brothers Moving LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00834
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Zoeller, David)
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Badger Brothers Moving LLC. (Modl, Michael)
November 6, 2019 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 12/10/2019 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jls)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Troy Dean Thompson for Defendant Badger Brothers Moving LLC. (Thompson, Troy)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER by Defendant Badger Brothers Moving LLC. (Modl, Michael)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Returned Executed. (Zoeller, David) Modified on 10/16/2019. (lak)
October 14, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Consent to Join Lawsuit by Plaintiffs Connor Neeck, Isaiah West, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Form - Ian T. Sedlacek) (Zoeller, David) Modified on 10/15/2019. (lak)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Badger Brothers Moving LLC. (jls)
October 9, 2019 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jls)
October 9, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Badger Brothers Moving LLC, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2555432.), filed by All Plaintiffs, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Form (Neeck), #2 Exhibit B - Consent Form (West), #3 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons) (Zoeller, David) Modified on 10/9/2019. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neeck, Connor et al v. Badger Brothers Moving LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connor Neeck
Represented By: Caitlin Marie Madden
Represented By: David C. Zoeller
Represented By: Vanessa Ann Kuettel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaiah West
Represented By: Caitlin Marie Madden
Represented By: David C. Zoeller
Represented By: Vanessa Ann Kuettel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Badger Brothers Moving LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Modl
Represented By: Troy Dean Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?