Hemling, Megan v. Soo Line Railroad Company et al
Plaintiff: Megan Hemling
Defendant: Soo Line Railroad Company, Cedar Creek Holdings, Inc., BlueLinx Corporation and Cedar Creek, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00894
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Crossclaim by Cross Claimant Cedar Creek, LLC. (Abrahamson, Jeffrey)
December 10, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Paul Anthony Banker for Plaintiff Megan Hemling. (Banker, Paul)
December 9, 2019 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 1/15/2020 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jls)
December 6, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against Cedar Creek, LLC by Defendant Soo Line Railroad Company. (Baird, Brian) Modified on 12/6/2019. (lak)
December 6, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Cedar Creek, LLC. (Abrahamson, Jeffrey)
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against Soo Line Railroad Company by Defendant Cedar Creek, LLC. (Abrahamson, Jeffrey) Modified on 12/6/2019. (lak)
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cedar Creek, LLC, Soo Line Railroad Company, filed by Megan Hemling. (Leneave, Cortney) Modified on 11/22/2019: Corrected defendants. Main document replaced and additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2019: #1 Exhibit A - Order Appointing Personal Representative) (lak) E-mail sent to counsel.
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER by Defendant Soo Line Railroad Company. (Baird, Brian)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Brian D. Baird for Defendant Soo Line Railroad Company. (Baird, Brian)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Soo Line Railroad Company, d/b/a Canadian Pacific;BlueLinx Corporation, and Cedar Creek Holdings,Inc. (rks)
October 31, 2019 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (rks)
October 31, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (rks)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2568372.), filed by Megan Hemling, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Leneave, Cortney) Modified on 10/30/2019: Corrected parties and county. Case number missing from complaint and summons. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hemling, Megan v. Soo Line Railroad Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Hemling
Represented By: Cortney S. Leneave
Represented By: Paul Anthony Banker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soo Line Railroad Company
Represented By: Brian D. Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedar Creek Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BlueLinx Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedar Creek, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Allen Abrahamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?