Weyer, Dana et al v. Valley Communities Credit Union et al
Appellee: Valley Communities Credit Union and Chapter 13 Trustee
Appellant: Dana A. Weyer and Lori A. Weyer
Case Number: 3:2019cv00926
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Filing 3 Supplemental Record from Bankruptcy Court Case Number 18-13665. (Attachments: #1 Weyer Final Decision) (arw)
December 27, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Appeal Record from Bankruptcy Court Case Number 18-13665. Documents from the Bankruptcy case can be found #here. Brief in Support due 1/26/2020. Brief in Opposition due 2/25/2020. Brief in Reply due 3/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Order being Appealed, #3 Full Docket Sheet, #4 Docket Sheet with Designations, #5 Appellants Designations, #6 Appellee Designations, #7 Statement of Issues, #8 October 3, 2019 Hearing Transcript, #9 October 17, 2019 Hearing Transcript, #10 Weyer Claim 43, #11 Weyer Claim 44) (arw)
November 18, 2019 Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (arw)
November 18, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-13665. Filed by Dana A. Weyer, Lori A. Weyer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice and Order, #2 Order, #3 Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet) (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weyer, Dana et al v. Valley Communities Credit Union et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Valley Communities Credit Union
Represented By: Justin Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Chapter 13 Trustee
Represented By: Leslie Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Dana A. Weyer
Represented By: Dejan Adzic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Lori A. Weyer
Represented By: Dejan Adzic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?