Arandas Fuentes LLC v. Arandas Zuniga LLC et al
Plaintiff: Arandas Fuentes LLC
Defendant: Arandas Zuniga LLC, Juan L. Cazares and Jesus Inocente Ramirez Zuniga
Case Number: 3:2019cv00961
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), this case is closed without further order of the court. (voc)
January 17, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Arandas Fuentes LLC (Bolton, Richard)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Plaintiff Arandas Fuentes LLC moves for default judgment against defendants Arandas Zuniga LLC and Jesus Inocente Ramirez Zuniga, Dkt. #8 , and the clerk has entered default against them, Dkt. #9 . Plaintiff's motion doesn't include defendant Juan L. Cazares, and the docket doesn't show whether plaintiff has achieved service on Cazares. The court will defer ruling on the motion until it has an indication as to how the case will proceed against Cazares. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 1/13/2020. (voc)
January 8, 2020 Filing 9 Clerk's Entry of Default as to Defendants Arandas Zuniga LLC and Jesus Inocente Ramirez Zuniga (voc)
January 6, 2020 Filing 8 Motion for Default Judgment as to Defendants Arandas Zuniga LLC and Jesus Inocente Ramirez Zuniga, by Plaintiff Arandas Fuentes LLC. (Bolton, Richard) Modified on 1/6/2020. (lak)
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Arandas Zuniga LLC served on 11/26/2019, answer due 12/17/2019. (Bolton, Richard)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Jesus Inocente Ramirez Zuniga served on 11/26/2019, answer due 12/17/2019. (Bolton, Richard)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Arandas Zuniga LLC, Juan L. Cazares, Jesus Inocente Ramirez Zuniga. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Jesus Inocente Ramirez Zuniga, #2 Summons Juan L. Cazares) (Inc.) (voc)
November 25, 2019 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (voc)
November 25, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (voc)
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Richard L. Bolton for Plaintiff Arandas Fuentes LLC. (Bolton, Richard)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Joseph William Byrne for Plaintiff Arandas Fuentes LLC. (Byrne, Joseph)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Arandas Fuentes LLC. (Byrne, Joseph) Modified on 11/22/2019. (lak)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2582340.), filed by Arandas Fuentes LLC, (Attachments: #1 Summons - Arandas Zuniga LLC#2 Summons - Jesus Inocente Ramirez Zuniga, #3 Summons - Juan L. Cazares, #4 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Byrne, Joseph) Modified on 11/22/2019: Corrected all parties; summonses are incomplete. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arandas Fuentes LLC v. Arandas Zuniga LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arandas Zuniga LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan L. Cazares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesus Inocente Ramirez Zuniga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arandas Fuentes LLC
Represented By: Joseph William Byrne
Represented By: Richard L. Bolton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?