United States of America v. $8,956.00 in U.S. Currency et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $38,936.79 in U.S. Currency Seized from Summit Credit Union, Account No. XXXXX2415 and $8,956.00 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 3:2019cv00965
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:0881
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #9 Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 1/3/2020. (rks)
January 2, 2020 Filing 11 Response Stating No Opposition by Plaintiff United States of America re: #9 Motion to Stay, filed by $8,956.00 in U.S. Currency, $38,936.79 in U.S. Currency Seized from Summit Credit Union, Account No. XXXXX2415. (Luehring, Heidi)
January 2, 2020 Reset Briefing Deadlines as to #9 Motion to Stay Civil Forfeiture Proceedings Pursuant to Fifth Amendment Protections Embodied in 18 U.S.C. Section 981(g)(2). Brief in Opposition due 1/16/2020. Brief in Reply due 1/23/2020. (rks/slc)
December 31, 2019 Filing 10 Demand for Trial by Jury by Defendants $38,936.79 in U.S. Currency Seized from Summit Credit Union, Account No. XXXXX2415, $8,956.00 in U.S. Currency. (Delyea, Anthony) Modified on 1/2/2020: Pleading refers to plaintiffs demand for a jury trial. (lak)
December 31, 2019 Filing 9 Motion to Stay Civil Forfeiture Proceedings Pursuant to Fifth Amendment Protections Embodied in 18 U.S.C. Section 981(g)(2) by Defendants $38,936.79 in U.S. Currency Seized from Summit Credit Union, Account No. XXXXX2415, $8,956.00 in U.S. Currency. Response due 1/7/2020. (Delyea, Anthony) Modified on 1/2/2020: Claim filed and claimants added? (lak)
December 31, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (Delyea, Anthony) Modified on 12/31/2019. (lak)
December 31, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Anthony C. Delyea for Defendants $38,936.79 in U.S. Currency Seized from Summit Credit Union, Account No. XXXXX2415, $8,956.00 in U.S. Currency. (Delyea, Anthony) Modified on 12/31/2019. (lak)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 Warrant for Arrest in Rem Issued. (rks)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/27/2019. (rks)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 Brief in Support of #3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem by Plaintiff United States of America (Luehring, Heidi)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Warrant) (Luehring, Heidi)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 Declaration of Caleb Johnson re: #1 Complaint. (Luehring, Heidi)
November 25, 2019 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (rks)
November 25, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (rks)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Luehring, Heidi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $8,956.00 in U.S. Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $38,936.79 in U.S. Currency Seized from Summit Credit Union, Account No. XXXXX2415
Represented By: Anthony C. Delyea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $8,956.00 in U.S. Currency
Represented By: Anthony C. Delyea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Heidi Luehring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?