Turner, Glenn v. Boughton, Gary et al
Plaintiff: Glenn T. Turner
Defendant: Ms. Mink, Scott Rubin-Asch, Lebbeus Brown, Gary Boughton, Dr. Johnson, Mark Kartman, Dr. Hoem and Dr. Schwinn
Not Classified By Court: WSPF Prison Facility
Case Number: 3:2019cv01001
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Filing 7 Warden PLRA Letter. (rks),(ps)
January 10, 2020 Partial Filing fee received : $17.22, receipt number 34690036137. (rks),(ps)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 17.22 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 1/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 12/13/2019. (jef),(ps)
December 13, 2019 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Glenn T. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/13/2019: #2 IPP Calculation) (jef).
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff Glenn T. Turner to submit Trust Fund Account Statement by 1/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 12/10/2019. (nln),(ps)
December 9, 2019 Filing 3 Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to the DOJ's Three Strikes Certification That Plaintiff Struckout, filed by Plaintiff Glenn T. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Certification as to Three or More Dismissals Under Wis. Stat. 801.02(7)(d), #2 Letter to WI DOJ from Plaintiff dated 11/3/19, #3 Copy of Order dated 9/24/01 entered in 01-CV-314, #4 Copy of Order dated 10/2/01 entered in 01-CV-314, #5 Copy of Dismissal Order dated 10/18/11 entered in Dane County Case No. 11-CV-4378, #6 Copy of Decision and Order dated 10/18/11 entered in Dane County Case No. 11-cv-4378, #7 Copy of Dismissal Order dated 9/11/14 entered in Dane County Case No. 14-CV-2555) (nln),(ps)
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Glenn T. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Authorization for Release of Institutional Account Information and Payment of the Filing Fee) (nln),(ps)
December 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Plaintiff Glenn T. Turner. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Conduct Report #143371, #2 Attachment B - Clinical Services Brief Diagnostic Summary - SMCI, #3 Cover Letter) (nln),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner, Glenn v. Boughton, Gary et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Mink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Rubin-Asch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lebbeus Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Boughton
Represented By: Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Kartman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Hoem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Schwinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: WSPF Prison Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn T. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?