Owens, Allan et al v. Chamberlain, P. et al
Plaintiff: Toby Thompson and Allan Dean Owens
Defendant: L. Bartow, C. Jess, Terry Krombos, ex Warden Marc Clements, J. Bovee, John & Jane Doe 1-5, Jon Litscher, Emily Davidson, Brad Hompe, Randall Hepp, P. Chamberlain, M. Greenwood, Anthony Holt, K. Billie, Ed Wall, Greg Phal, Chris Kruger, Chris O'Connell and Captain B. Mlodzik
Case Number: 3:2020cv00033
Filed: January 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Plaintiff Toby Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nln),(ps)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting Plaintiff Allan Owens #11 Motion for Extension of Time. Owens' Initial partial filing fee due 3/18/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 02/26/2020. (aom),(ps)
February 24, 2020 Filing 11 Motion for Extension of Time by Plaintiff Allan Dean Owens. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting plaintiff Toby Thompson's #9 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff Thompson's $400 filing fee or motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee and Trust Fund Account Statement due 3/17/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 2/21/2020. (jef),(ps)
February 20, 2020 Filing 9 Letter from plaintiff Toby Thompson regarding filing fee. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (aom),(ps)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that plaintiff Toby Thompson to submit $400 filing fee or IFP motion along with Trust Fund Account Statement by 2/25/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 2/04/2020. (nln),(ps)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 45.39 assessed as to Allan Dean Owens due by 2/25/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 2/4/2020. (rks/jef),(ps)
February 4, 2020 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Allan Dean Owens. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope, #3 IPP Calculation) (rks),(ps)
January 24, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT (dkt. #1 with plaintiff Toby Thompson signature added). (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
January 14, 2020 Filing 4 Clerk's office letter returning #1 complaint to plaintiff Thompson for his signature. (nln),(ps)
January 14, 2020 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Allan Dean Owens. (Attachments: #1 Four (4) Attorney Rejection Letters) (nln),(ps)
January 14, 2020 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Allan Dean Owens. (nln),(ps)
January 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Plaintiffs Allan Dean Owens, Toby Thompson. Note: see dkt. #5 for both signatures. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Fox Lake Correctional Institution - Housing Unit Replacement Phase 1, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Cover Letter and Envelope) (nln),(ps) Modified on 1/24/2020 (jef).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owens, Allan et al v. Chamberlain, P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Bartow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Jess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Krombos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ex Warden Marc Clements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Bovee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John & Jane Doe 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Litscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Hompe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Hepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Chamberlain
Represented By: Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Greenwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Billie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Phal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Kruger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain B. Mlodzik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toby Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allan Dean Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?