Banks, Dasia v. Baraboo School District
Plaintiff: Dasia F. Banks
Defendant: Baraboo School District
Case Number: 3:2020cv00036
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Pretrial Conference Order: # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge William M. Conley attached. Amendments to the Pleadings due 5/4/2020. Dispositive Motions due 1/15/2021. Settlement Letters due 5/7/2021. Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures and Motions in Limine due 5/14/2021. Responses due 5/28/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/8/2021 at 4:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 6/21/2021 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 3/10/2020. (arw)
March 5, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 3/5/2020 [:05] (cak)
February 25, 2020 Filing 7 Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report by Plaintiff Dasia F. Banks (Kinne, Paul)
February 18, 2020 Case randomly reassigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
February 14, 2020 Reminder to Counsel: If you have not already provided your #Consent to Magistrate/Request for Reassignment form, it is due by 2/20/2020. (lak)
February 6, 2020 Set Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 3/5/2020 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. #Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached. (arw)
February 4, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Lori Marie Lubinsky for Defendant Baraboo School District. (Lubinsky, Lori)
February 4, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER by Defendant Baraboo School District. (Tierney, Danielle)
February 4, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Danielle B Tierney for Defendant Baraboo School District. (Tierney, Danielle)
January 28, 2020 Filing 3 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Baraboo School District served on 1/17/2020, answer due 2/7/2020. (Kinne, Paul)
January 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Baraboo School District. (arw)
January 17, 2020 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (arw)
January 17, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw)
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Baraboo School District (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0758-2610549) filed by Dasia F. Banks. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kinne, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banks, Dasia v. Baraboo School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baraboo School District
Represented By: Danielle B Tierney
Represented By: Lori Marie Lubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dasia F. Banks
Represented By: Paul A. Kinne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?